EP2093685 - Drug administration device having a bolus administration profile controller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F.HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Remde, Axel Bahnstrasse 21 3432 Lützelflüh-Goldbach / CH | 02 /
Kalt, Lucas Wankdorffeldstrasse 105 3014 Bern / CH | [2009/35] | Representative(s) | Poredda, Andreas, et al c/o Roche Diabetes Care AG Patent Department Kirchbergstrasse 190 3401 Burgdorf / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | Poredda, Andreas, et al C/o Roche Diabetes Care AG Patent Department Kirchbergstrasse 190 3401 Burgdorf / CH | ||
Former [2009/35] | Poredda, Andreas, et al Disetronic Medical Systems AG Kirchbergstrasse 190 3401 Burgdorf / CH | Application number, filing date | 08003164.4 | 21.02.2008 | [2009/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2093685 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, // A61M5/142 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
A61M5/14244 (EP,US);
G16H20/17 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14208 (EP,US);
A61M2205/502 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/35] | Title | German: | Medizinische Verabreichungsvorrichtung mit Bolus-Profilsteuerung | [2009/35] | English: | Drug administration device having a bolus administration profile controller | [2009/35] | French: | Dispositif d'administration médical ayant un contrôleur de profil d'administration de bolus | [2009/35] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/09] | 13.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/52] | 10.02.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003160683 (BLOMQUIST MICHAEL L [US]) [X] 1-5,8-18 * abstract * * figures 1,2,14,17,25,27-30 * * paragraphs [0028] - [0037] - [0045] - [0048] - [0113] - [0115] - [0123] , [0132] , [0148] - [0168] - [0175] , [0179] , [0182] * * paragraphs [0183] , [0198] - [0202] - [0211] - [0218] - [0226] - [0229] - [0248] *; | [X]WO2006124716 (UNIV BOSTON [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-9,13,17 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * page 1, line 25 - page 4, line 12 * * page 8, line 6 - page 10, line 10 * * claims 1,4,7-9,11,13,15,18,27 *; | [X]US2003114836 (ESTES MARK C [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8-10,13,16 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0009] , [0011] , [0013] , [0026] - [0033] - [0046] - [0051] - [0065] - [0070] - [0074] , [0082] - [0085] *; | [X]WO2006089965 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,2,8,10,13,16 * abstract * * figures 10-20 * * page 1 - page 5 * * page 7 - page 9 * * page 13 - page 14 * * page 16 - page 17 *; | [A]EP1338295 (LIFESCAN INC [US]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * figures 3A,3B,3C * * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0029] - [0031] - [0040] , [0065] - [0071] * | by applicant | US6878132 | EP0991440 | US6248093 | US2005238507 | US6736796 | US4562751 | WO2007056592 | EP1124600 | EP0991440 |