EP1972812 - Disc spring lever for a friction clutch with abrasion adjustment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2012/11] |
Former [2011/21] | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states LuK Lamellen und Kupplungsbau Beteiligungs KG Industriestrasse 3 77815 Bühl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lindenbaum, Tobias Tiergartenweg 4 76530 Baden-Baden / DE | [2008/39] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/45] | Application number, filing date | 08003330.1 | 25.02.2008 | [2008/39] | Priority number, date | DE20071013784 | 22.03.2007 Original published format: DE102007013784 | [2008/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1972812 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1972812 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | [2010/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1972812 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16D13/75, F16D13/58 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
F16D13/757 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/39] | F16D13/75 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/39] | Title | German: | Tellerfederhebel für eine Reibungskupplung mit Verschleissnachstellung | [2008/39] | English: | Disc spring lever for a friction clutch with abrasion adjustment | [2008/39] | French: | Levier de ressort à disque pour un embrayage à friction doté d'un ajustage de l'usure | [2008/39] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/18] | 25.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2008 | CY | 09.11.2011 | CZ | 09.11.2011 | DK | 09.11.2011 | EE | 09.11.2011 | FI | 09.11.2011 | HR | 09.11.2011 | IE | 09.11.2011 | IT | 09.11.2011 | LT | 09.11.2011 | LV | 09.11.2011 | MT | 09.11.2011 | NL | 09.11.2011 | PL | 09.11.2011 | RO | 09.11.2011 | SE | 09.11.2011 | SI | 09.11.2011 | SK | 09.11.2011 | TR | 09.11.2011 | BG | 09.02.2012 | NO | 09.02.2012 | GR | 10.02.2012 | ES | 20.02.2012 | GB | 25.02.2012 | LU | 25.02.2012 | BE | 28.02.2012 | CH | 29.02.2012 | LI | 29.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | IS | 09.03.2012 | PT | 09.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MT | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
TR | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
GB | 25.02.2012 | ||
LU | 25.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MT | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
TR | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
GB | 25.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MT | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
GB | 25.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
GB | 25.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
GB | 25.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
GB | 25.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 09.11.2011 | |
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
NO | 09.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB915880 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG) [A] 1-3* figures 7,8 *; | [A]DE1945233 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU) [A] 1-3 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1568905 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3a *; | [A]WO2006105750 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE], et al) [A] 1-3 * figures 1,2, 2a, 2b * |