EP1970159 - Processing machine with means for recording processing parameters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peter Wolters GmbH Büsumer Strasse 96 24768 Rendsburg / DE | [2008/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Harald Brunnenstrasse 15 56338 Braubach / DE | [2008/38] | Representative(s) | Graalfs, Edo Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Graalfs, Edo Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/38] | Graalfs, Edo Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08003417.6 | 26.02.2008 | [2008/38] | Priority number, date | DE20071011880 | 13.03.2007 Original published format: DE102007011880 | [2008/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1970159 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B24B7/17, B24B37/04, B24B49/14, B24B49/16, H04Q9/00, G08C17/02, G08C23/04 | [2008/38] | CPC: |
B24B7/17 (EP,US);
B24B37/015 (EP,US);
B24B37/08 (EP,US);
B24B49/16 (EP,US);
H04Q9/00 (EP,US);
Y10T409/305824 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/21] |
Former [2008/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bearbeitungsmaschine mit Mitteln zur Erfassung von Bearbeitungsparametern | [2008/38] | English: | Processing machine with means for recording processing parameters | [2008/38] | French: | Machine de traitement dotée de moyens de détermination de paramètres de traitement | [2008/38] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 23.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US2003119429 (BRIGHT NICOLAS [US], et al) [DA] 1-9 * paragraphs [0009] , [0015] , [0027] , [0028]; figure 1 *; | [A]JP2004358638 (SUMITOMO MITSUBISHI SILICON) [A] 1 * paragraph [0018]; figures 1-4 * * abstract *; | [A]DE10237682 (SARTORIUS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] * | by applicant | DE10344602 | DE102004040429 |