EP1965316 - Storage of multiple, related time-series data streams [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy & Automation, Inc. 3333 Old Milton Parkway Alpharetta, GA 30005-4437 / US | [2008/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Milam, Christopher, Patrick 22262 Parkwood Street Lake-Forest CA 92630 / US | [2008/36] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Michael Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Fischer, Michael Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08003459.8 | 26.02.2008 | [2008/36] | Priority number, date | US20070904099P | 27.02.2007 Original published format: US 904099 P | US20080036676 | 25.02.2008 Original published format: US 36676 | [2008/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1965316 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1965316 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G05B19/00, G05B19/418, G05B23/02 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
G05B19/4183 (EP,US);
G05B23/0264 (EP,US);
Y02P90/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/36] | G06F17/30, G05B19/00 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2013/06] |
Former [2008/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Speicherung von mehrfachen zusammenhängenden Zeitreihen-Datenströmen | [2008/36] | English: | Storage of multiple, related time-series data streams | [2008/36] | French: | Stockage de plusieurs flux de données en séries chronologiques associées | [2008/36] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/26] | 22.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2006039760 (IPOM PTY LTD [AU], et al) [I] 1-4,6-13,15 * page 1, line 32 - page 5, line 11 * * page 7, line 10 - page 9, line 15 * * page 10, line 30 - page 13, line 25 * * page 14, line 15 - page 16, line 19 * * page 17, line 23 - page 19, line 6 * * page 29, line 1 - page 30, line 22 * * page 34, line 29 - page 35, line 13 * * page 36, lines 13-23 *; | [I]US2002198679 (VICTOR HENDRIK JOHANNES [US], et al) [I] 1,4,6,7,10,13,15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0043] *; | [I]US2006187713 (WEETMAN CHAD R [US]) [I] 1,5,6,10,14,15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0059] *; | [I]US2007038889 (WIGGINS ROBERT D [US], et al) [I] 1,7,10 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0089] *; | [A]US2003120627 (EMERY MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006018738 (S I AUTOMATION [FR], et al) [A] 4 * the whole document * |