EP1962126 - Spectacles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Temming, Markus Isselhorster Strasse 374 33334 Gütersloh / DE | [2008/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Rolf, Gudrun Gudrun Rolf, LI.M., Rechtsanwältin Ritterstraße 19 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Rolf, Gudrun Rechtsanwältin Elsa-Brändström-Strasse 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 08003642.9 | 14.05.2004 | [2008/35] | Priority number, date | DE20031061797 | 31.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10361797 | [2008/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1962126 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1962126 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G02C5/22, G02C1/08 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
G02C5/146 (EP);
G02C1/08 (EP);
G02C5/2209 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/35] | Title | German: | Brille | [2008/35] | English: | Spectacles | [2008/35] | French: | Lunettes | [2008/35] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 21.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/25] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04011495.1 / EP1550896 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040011495) is 28.12.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0690331 (KILLER LOOP SPA [IT]) [A] 1-10* figures 2,3 *; | [A]WO0029897 (CHANG JI MOON [KR]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2003223032 (GAGNON MARIO [CA], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * | Examination | US6264326 |