EP2095959 - Ink cartridges and methods of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hattori, Shingo Brother Kogyo K.K. Intell. Property Dept. 1-1-1 Kawagishi Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 467-8562 / JP | 02 /
Kanbe, Tomohiro Brother Kogyo K.K. Intell. Property Dept. 1-1-1 Kawagishi Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 467-8562 / JP | [2009/36] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 08003701.3 | 28.02.2008 | [2009/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2095959 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2095959 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [2009/36] | CPC: |
B41J2/17566 (EP);
B41J2/17513 (EP);
B41J2/1752 (EP);
B41J2/17523 (EP);
B41J2/17553 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2009/52] |
Former [2009/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tintenpatronen und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2009/36] | English: | Ink cartridges and methods of manufacturing the same | [2009/36] | French: | Cartouches d'encre et leur procédé de fabrication | [2009/36] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 09.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003184626 (SASAKI TOYONORI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-4,6,7 * paragraph [0139]; figure 14 * * paragraph [0143] - paragraph [0148]; figures 15-17 * * paragraph [0151] * * paragraph [0162]; figure 25 *; | [X]EP1772270 (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0074]; figure 8 * * paragraph [0312]; figure 42 *; | [X]EP1886821 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-7 * abstract *; | [X]EP1792736 (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,7 * abstract * * paragraph [0124] - paragraph [0125]; figure 14 *; | [X]US2004130583 (SEINO TAKEO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,7 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044] *; | [X]US7188939 (SASAKI TOYONORI [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]EP1097814 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1849608 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] * abstract * |