EP1967802 - Apparatus for the storage and usage of feeding-bottles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Doro, Elio Via Cima da Conegliano 27/A 31020 San Pietro di Feletto (TV) / IT | [2008/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/37] | Representative(s) | D'Agostini, Giovanni D'Agostini Organizzazione S.r.l. Via G. Giusti 17 33100 Udine / IT | [2016/34] |
Former [2008/37] | D'Agostini, Giovanni D'AGOSTINI ORGANIZZAZIONE SRL, Via G. Giusti 17 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 08003746.8 | 29.02.2008 | [2008/37] | Priority number, date | IT2007UD00049 | 05.03.2007 Original published format: IT UD20070049 | [2008/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1967802 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1967802 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1967802 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F25D17/06, F25D23/12, F25D31/00, A61J9/04, // F25D23/06 | [2008/37] | CPC: |
F25D23/12 (EP);
F25D17/06 (EP);
F25D31/007 (EP);
A61J9/00 (EP);
F25D23/069 (EP);
F25D2331/803 (EP);
F25D2400/38 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/31] |
Former [2008/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Lagerung und Verwendung von Saugflaschen | [2008/37] | English: | Apparatus for the storage and usage of feeding-bottles | [2008/37] | French: | Appareil pour le stockage et l'utilisation de biberons | [2008/37] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 21.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.02.2008 | AT | 24.08.2016 | BE | 24.08.2016 | CY | 24.08.2016 | CZ | 24.08.2016 | DK | 24.08.2016 | EE | 24.08.2016 | ES | 24.08.2016 | FI | 24.08.2016 | HR | 24.08.2016 | LT | 24.08.2016 | LV | 24.08.2016 | MC | 24.08.2016 | NL | 24.08.2016 | PL | 24.08.2016 | RO | 24.08.2016 | SE | 24.08.2016 | SI | 24.08.2016 | SK | 24.08.2016 | TR | 24.08.2016 | BG | 24.11.2016 | NO | 24.11.2016 | GR | 25.11.2016 | IS | 24.12.2016 | PT | 26.12.2016 | CH | 28.02.2017 | IE | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | LU | 28.02.2017 | MT | 28.02.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 29.02.2008 | |
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
TR | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
IE | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
LU | 28.02.2017 | ||
MT | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 29.02.2008 | |
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
IE | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
LU | 28.02.2017 | ||
MT | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 29.02.2008 | |
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
IE | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
LU | 28.02.2017 | ||
MT | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
IE | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
LU | 28.02.2017 | ||
MT | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
IE | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
LU | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
LU | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 24.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US3042384 (BAUMAN HENRY J) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 1, line 8 - line 10 * * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 59 * * column 6, line 40 * [Y] 3 [I] 4-7; | [XI]DE3635171 (BLANC GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [I] 4-7; | [XYI]US3199579 (FOSTER LAWRENCE H ET AL) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * [Y] 3 [I] 5-7; | [XI]JP2005245976 (HOSHIZAKI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [I] 5-7; | [XYI]JP2004286277 (HOSHIZAKI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * [Y] 3 [I] 5-7; | [YA]NL1002515C (ARNAUD MARTIN WYNIA [NL]) [Y] 3 * the whole document * [A] 2; | [A]JP2000210131 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]US1881603 (HULL HARRY B) [A] 2 * the whole document * |