EP1967968 - Sharing of database objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/37] | Sharing of database objects | ||
[2014/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAP SE Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2014/43] |
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states SAP AG Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hempelmann, Henrik Alte Dorfstrasse 1 39539 Havelberg / DE | 02 /
Hahn, Uwe Onkel-Tom-Straße 146 14169 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Kittel, Martin Gubenerstrasse 43 10243 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Strahl, Torsten Ernst-Thällmann-Straße 84 A(rechts) 14532 Kleinmachnow / DE | [2008/37] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/37] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08004091.8 | 04.03.2008 | [2014/45] | Priority number, date | US20070715777 | 08.03.2007 Original published format: US 715777 | [2008/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1967968 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1967968 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2008/37] | CPC: |
G06F16/25 (EP,US);
Y10S707/966 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/37] | Title | German: | Gemeinsame Nutzung von Datenbankobjekten | [2014/45] | English: | Sharing of database objects | [2014/45] | French: | Partage d'objets d'une base de données | [2014/45] |
Former [2008/37] | Gemeinsame Nutzung von Datenbankobjekten | ||
Former [2008/37] | Sharing of database objects | ||
Former [2008/37] | Partage d'objets d'une base de données | Examination procedure | 03.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 31.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 30.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 25.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.03.2008 | AT | 05.11.2014 | BE | 05.11.2014 | BG | 05.11.2014 | CY | 05.11.2014 | CZ | 05.11.2014 | DK | 05.11.2014 | EE | 05.11.2014 | ES | 05.11.2014 | FI | 05.11.2014 | HR | 05.11.2014 | IT | 05.11.2014 | LT | 05.11.2014 | LV | 05.11.2014 | MC | 05.11.2014 | MT | 05.11.2014 | NL | 05.11.2014 | PL | 05.11.2014 | RO | 05.11.2014 | SE | 05.11.2014 | SI | 05.11.2014 | SK | 05.11.2014 | TR | 05.11.2014 | NO | 05.02.2015 | GR | 06.02.2015 | IE | 04.03.2015 | LU | 04.03.2015 | IS | 05.03.2015 | PT | 05.03.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 04.03.2008 | |
AT | 05.11.2014 | ||
BG | 05.11.2014 | ||
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
MT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
TR | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IE | 04.03.2015 | ||
LU | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
MT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IE | 04.03.2015 | ||
LU | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IE | 04.03.2015 | ||
LU | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IE | 04.03.2015 | ||
LU | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
LU | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
LU | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
LU | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 05.11.2014 | |
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 05.11.2014 | |
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 05.11.2014 | |
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 05.11.2014 | |
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 05.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - ORACLE, "Oracle Database Administator's Guide 10g Release 1 (10.1) Part No. B10739-01", INTERNET PUBLICATION, (200312), URL: http://www.stanford.edu/dept/itss/docs/oracle/10g/server.101/b10739.pdf, (20080702), XP002486701 [X] 1-15 * pages 29-21, line 6 - pages 29-22, line 26 * * pages 30-28, line 3 - pages 30-30, line 10 * | [X] - LISKIN M, Microsoft Access 97 for Windows SuperGuide, MACMILLAN COMPUTER PUBLISHING USA, (1997), ISBN 1-56276-437-3, XP002486703 [X] 1-15 * page 696, line 19 - page 697, line 3 * * page 701, line 17 - page 704, line 24 * | [A] - ORACLE, "Oracle Database Concepts 10g Release 2 (10.2) B14220-02", INTERNET PUBLICATION, (200510), URL: http://download-west.oracle.com/docs/cd/B19306_01/server.102/b14220.pdf, (20080702), XP002486702 [A] 1-15 * pages 1-8, line 4 - pages 1-12, line 7 * | [A] - GARCIA-MOLINA H ET AL, Database Systems The complete book, PRENTICE-HALL, INC., (2002), XP002486704 [A] 1-15 * section "12.3 Representing Block and Record Addresses" * |