EP1935991 - Nucleic acid vaccines for prevention of flavivirus infection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Government of the United States of America, as represented by the Secretary, Department of Health & Human Services Technology Transfer Office, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, 1600 Clifton Road, N.E., MS E-67 Atlanta, Georgia 30333 / US | [2008/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chang, Gwong-Jen J. 4237 Beaver Creek Drive Fort Collins, CO 80522 / US | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2008/26] | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 08004141.1 | 04.04.2002 | [2008/26] | Priority number, date | US20010826115 | 04.04.2001 Original published format: US 826115 | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1935991 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1935991 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | [2008/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1935991 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/70, G01N33/53, C12P21/06, C07K16/00, C07H21/04, A61K39/12, C07K14/18, C07K16/10, G01N33/569 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C12N15/11 (KR);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K16/1081 (EP,US);
C12Q1/701 (EP,US);
G01N33/56983 (EP,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K2039/70 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/02 (EP,US);
C12N2770/24022 (EP,US);
C12N2770/24122 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2008/26] | Title | German: | Nukleinsäure-Impfstoffe zur Vorbeugung gegen Flavivirusinfektionen | [2008/26] | English: | Nucleic acid vaccines for prevention of flavivirus infection | [2008/26] | French: | Vaccins d'acide nucléique pour la prévention d'infection du flavivirus | [2008/26] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/26] | 18.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02763960.8 / EP1383931 | Divisional application(s) | EP10177282.0 / EP2332572 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020763960) is 02.09.2005 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.11.2012 | BE | 07.11.2012 | CY | 07.11.2012 | DK | 07.11.2012 | FI | 07.11.2012 | IT | 07.11.2012 | MC | 07.11.2012 | NL | 07.11.2012 | SE | 07.11.2012 | TR | 07.11.2012 | GR | 08.02.2013 | ES | 18.02.2013 | PT | 07.03.2013 | LU | 04.04.2013 | CH | 30.04.2013 | LI | 30.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
MC | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
TR | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
MC | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/01] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
MC | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 07.11.2012 | |
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 07.11.2012 | |
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 07.11.2012 | |
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 07.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]WO9306214 (US HEALTH [US]) [DY] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9837911 (ORAVAX INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9963095 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [Y] - PLETNEV A G ET AL, "CONSTRUCTION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF CHIMERIC TICK-BORNE ENCEPHALITIS/DENGUE TYPE 4 VIRUSES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (19921101), vol. 89, no. 21, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 10532 - 10536, XP002073935 [Y] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.21.10532 | [Y] - CHANG GWONG-JEN J ET AL, "A single intramuscular injection of recombinant plasmid DNA induces protective immunity and prevents Japanese encephalitis in mice", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (200005), vol. 74, no. 9, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 4244 - 4252, XP002301741 [Y] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.74.9.4244-4252.2000 | [A] - ARROYO J ET AL, "Molecular basis for attenuation of neurovirulence of a yellow fever virus/Japanese encephalitis virus chimera vaccine (chimerivax-je)", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (200101), vol. 75, no. 2, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 934 - 942, XP002967301 [A] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.75.2.934-942.2001 | [A] - GUIRAKHOO F ET AL, "Recombinant chimeric yellow fever-dengue type 2 virus is immunogenic and protective in nonhuman primates", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (200006), vol. 74, no. 12, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 5477 - 5485, XP002165591 [A] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.74.12.5477-5485.2000 | [A] - KOCHEL T ET AL, "Inoculation of plasmids expressing the dengue-2 envelope gene elicit neutralizing antibodies in mice", VACCINE, BUTTERWORTH SCIENTIFIC. GUILDFORD, GB, (19970405), vol. 15, no. 5, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 547 - 552, XP004059894 [A] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(97)00215-6 | [A] - PHILLPOTTS R J ET AL, "Immunisation with DNA polynucleotides protects mice against lethal challenge with St. Louis encephalitis virus", ARCHIVES OF VIROLOGY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (1996), vol. 141, no. 3/4, ISSN 0304-8608, pages 743 - 749, XP002119031 [A] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01718332 | [A] - KONISHI E ET AL, "Induction of protective immunity against Japanese encephalitis in mice by immunization with a plasmid encoding Japanese encephalitis virus premembrane and envelope genes", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (199806), vol. 72, no. 6, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 4925 - 4930, XP002119029 [A] 1-22 * the whole document * | [A] - LIN Y L (REPRINT) ET AL, "DNA immunization with Japanese encephalitis virus nonstructural protein NS1 elicits protective immunity in mice", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (199801), vol. 72, no. 1, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 191 - 200, XP002119030 [A] 1-22 * the whole document * | [PX] - CHANG G-J J ET AL, "FLAVIVIRUS DNA VACCINES CURRENT STATUS AND POTENTIAL", ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NEW YORK, NY, US, (200112), vol. 951, ISSN 0077-8923, pages 272 - 285, XP009033267 [PX] 1-22 * the whole document * | [PX] - DAVIS B S ET AL, "West Nile virus recombinant DNA vaccine protects mouse and horse from virus challenge and expresses in vitro a noninfectious recombinant antigen that can be used in enzyme-linked immunosorbent assays", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (200105), vol. 75, no. 9, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 4040 - 4047, XP002239873 [PX] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.75.9.4040-4047.2001 | [T] - CHANG GWONG-JEN J ET AL, "Enhancing biosynthesis and secretion of premembrane and envelope proteins by the chimeric plasmid of dengue virus type 2 and Japanese encephalitis virus.", VIROLOGY, (20030201), vol. 306, no. 1, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 170 - 180, XP002301742 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0042-6822(02)00028-4 | by applicant | US3610795 | US4810492 | US5021347 | WO9306214 | US5229293 | US5494671 | US5514375 | US5545806 | US5569825 | US5625126 | - KUNO ET AL., J. VIROL., (1998), vol. 72, pages 73 - 83 | - MONATH, Virology, RAVEN PRESS, (1990), pages 763 - 814 | - HEINZ; ROEHRIG, Immunochemistry of Viruses II: The Basis for Serodiagnosis and Vaccines, ELSEVIER, (1990), pages 289 - 305 | - SUMIYOSHI, VIROLOGY, (1987), vol. 161, pages 497 - 510 | - HASHIMOTO ET AL., VIRUS GENES, (1988), vol. 1, pages 305 - 317 | - NITAYAPHAN ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1990), vol. 177, pages 541 - 552 | - DEUBEL ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1986), vol. 155, pages 365 - 377 | - GRUENBERG ET AL., J. GEN. VIROL., (1988), vol. 69, pages 1391 - 1398 | - HAHN ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1988), vol. 162, pages 167 - 180 | - OSATOMI ET AL., VIRUS GENES, (1988), vol. 2, pages 99 - 108 | - MACKOW ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1987), vol. 159, pages 217 - 228 | - ZHAO ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1986), vol. 155, pages 77 - 88 | - LANCIOTTI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 286, pages 2331 - 2333 | - MANDL ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1993), vol. 194, pages 173 - 184 | - RICE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, pages 726 - 733 | - SMITHBURN ET AL., AM. J. TROP. MED. HYG., (1940), vol. 20, pages 471 - 492 | - HUBALEK ET AL., EMERG. INFECT. DIS., (1999), vol. 5, pages 643 - 50 | - MONATH; TSAI, Clinical Virology, (1997), pages 1133 - 1186 | - ASNIS ET AL., CLIN. INFECT. DIS., (2000), vol. 30, pages 413 - 418 | - ANDERSON ET AL., SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 286, pages 2331 - 2333 | - JIA ET AL., LANCET, (1999), vol. 354, pages 1971 - 1972 | - LANCIOTTI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 286, pages 2333 - 2337 | - MORB. MORTAL. WKLY. REP., (2000), vol. 49, pages 178 - 179 | - GARMENDIA ET AL., J. CLIN. MICRO., (2000), vol. 38, pages 3110 - 3111 | - MORB. MORTAL. WKLY. REP., (2000), vol. 49, pages 820 - 822 | - TSAI ET AL., Vaccines, (1999), pages 672 - 710 | - TSAI ET AL., VACCINES, (1994), pages 671 - 713 | - CAB INTERNATIONAL, (1997), pages 23 - 44 | - KONISHI ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1991), vol. 180, no. 10, pages 401 - 4 | - KONISHI ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1992), vol. 188, pages 714 - 720 | - DMITRIEV ET AL., J. BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 44, pages 97 - 103 | - ZHAO ET AL., J. VIROL., (1987), vol. 61, pages 4019 - 4022 | - ZHANG, J. VIROL., (1988), vol. 62, pages 3027 - 3031 | - BRAY ET AL., J. VIROL., (1989), vol. 63, pages 2853 - 2856 | - FALGOUT ET AL., J. VIROL, (1989), vol. 63, pages 1852 - 1860 | - FALGOUT ET AL., J. VIROL., (1990), vol. 64, pages 4356 - 4363 | - ZHANG ET AL., J. VIROL, (1988), vol. 62, pages 3027 - 3031 | - LAI ET AL., Vaccines, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY, (1990), vol. 90, pages 119 - 124 | - PHILLPOTTS ET AL., ARCH. VIROL., (1996), vol. 141, pages 743 - 749 | - KOCHEL ET AL., VACCINE, (1997), vol. 15, pages 547 - 552 | - PHILJPOTTS ET AL., ARCH. VIROL., (1996), vol. 141, pages 743 - 749 | - HENNESSY ET AL., LANCET, (1996), vol. 347, pages 1583 - 1586 | - KOZAK, MOL. CELL. BIOLOGY, (1989), vol. 9, pages 5134 - 5142 | - SATO ET AL., SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 273, pages 352 - 354 | - KLINMAN, VACCINE, (1998), vol. 17, pages 19 - 25 | - KUNO, J. VIROL., (1998), vol. 72, pages 73 - 83 | - AZEVEDO ET AL., BRAZ. J. MED. BIOL. RES., (1999), vol. 32, pages 147 - 153 | - Synthetic Vaccines, CRC PRESS, (1987), pages 83 - 92 | - MIR ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 4262 - 4267 | - KOHLER ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, pages 495 - 97 | - ALVAREZ ET AL., HUM. GENE THER., (1997), vol. 8, pages 229 - 242 | - YANG ET AL., NATURE, (1996), vol. 382, pages 319 - 324 | - KIMURA-KURODA ET AL., J. VIROL., (1983), vol. 45, pages 124 - 132 | - KIMURA-KURODA ET AL., J. GEN. VIROL., (1986), vol. 67, pages 2663 - 2672 | - ZHANG ET AL., J. MED. VIROL., (1989), vol. 29, pages 133 - 138 | - ROEHRIG ET AL., VIROL., (1983), vol. 128, pages 118 - 126 | - LAEMMLI, NATURE, (1970), vol. 277, pages 680 - 685 | - HENCHAL ET AL., AMER. J. TROP. MED. HYG., (1982), vol. 31, pages 830 - 836 | - KONISHI ET AL., VIROL., (1992), vol. 188, pages 714 - 720 | - CLARKE; CASALS, AMER. J. TROP. MED. HYG., (1958), vol. 7, pages 561 - 573 | - ROEHRIG ET AL., VIROL., (1989), vol. 171, pages 49 - 60 | - HUNT; CALISHER, AMER. J. TROP. MED. HYG., (1979), vol. 28, pages 740 - 749 | - CHANG ET AL., J. VIROL., (2000), vol. 74, pages 4244 - 4252 | - HENCHAL ET AL., AM. J. TROP. MED. HYG., (1982), vol. 31, pages 830 - 836 | - CHANG ET AL., J. VIROL., (2000), vol. 74, pages 4244 - 4452 | - HENCHAL ET AL., AM. J. TROP. MED. HYG., (1983), vol. 31, pages 830 - 836 | - ROEHRIG ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1983), vol. 128, pages 118 - 126 | - AIZAWA ET AL., APPL. ENVIRO. MICRO., (1980), vol. 39, pages 54 - 57 | - CLARKE ET AL., AM. J. TROP. MED. HYG., (1958), vol. 7, pages 561 - 573 | - JOHNSON ET AL., J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., (2000), vol. 38, pages 1827 - 1831 | - MARTIN ET AL., J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., (2000), vol. 38, pages 1823 - 1826 | - TARDEI ET AL., J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., (1940), vol. 38, pages 2232 - 2239 | - MIR ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 4262 - 4267 | - MIR ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (1999), vol. 96, pages 4262 - 4267 | - TRENT ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1987), vol. 156, pages 293 - 304 | - SANTOS ET AL., VIRUS RESEARCH, (1995), vol. 35, pages 35 - 41 | - GRUENBERG ET AL., J. GEN. VIROL., (1988), vol. 69, pages 1301 - 1398 | - VON HEIJNE, "Signal sequences. The limits of variation", J. MOL. BIOL., (1985), vol. 184, pages 99 - 105 | - LOBIGS, "Flavivirus premembrane protein cleavage and spike heterodimer secretion require the function of the viral proteinase NS3", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U S A., (1993), vol. 90, pages 6218 - 6222 | - "Prediction of signal peptides and signal anchors by a hidden Markov model", HENRIK NIELSEN ET AL., Proceedings of the Sixth International Conference on Intelligent Systems for Molecular Biology (ISMB 6, AAAI PRESS, (1998), pages 122 - 130 | - NIELSEN ET AL., "Machine learning approaches to the prediction of signal peptides and other protein sorting signals", PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1999), vol. 12, pages 3 - 9 | - NIELSEN ET AL., "A neural network method for identification of prokaryotic and eukaryotic signal peptides and prediction of their cleavage sites", INT. J. NEURAL SYS., (1997), vol. 8, pages 581 - 599 | - CHANG ET AL., "Flavivirus DNA vaccines: current status and potential", ANNALS OF NYACAD. SCI., (2001), vol. 951, pages 272 - 285 | - SAKAGUCHI ET AL., "Functions of Signal and Signal-Anchor Sequences are Determined by the Balance Between the Hydrophobic Segment and the N-Terminal Charge", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 16 - 19 | - LIN ET AL., "DNA immunization with Japanese encephalitis virus nonstructural protein NS1 elicits protective immunity in mice", J. VIROL., (1998), vol. 72, pages 191 - 200 | - KONISHI ET AL., "Induction of protective immunity against Japanese encephalitis in mice by immunization with a plasmid encoding Japanese encephalitis virus premembrane and envelope genes", J. VIROL., (1998), vol. 72, pages 4925 - 4930 | - CHANG ET AL., "A single intramuscular injection of recombinant plasmid DNA induces protective immunity and prevents Japanese encephalitis in mice", J. VIROL., (2000), vol. 74, pages 4244 - 4252 | - DAVIS ET AL., "West Nile virus recombinant DNA vaccine protects mouse and horse from virus challenge and expresses in vitro a noninfectious recombinant antigen that can be used in enzyme-linked immunosorbent assays", J. VIROL., (2001), vol. 75, pages 4040 - 4047 | - GUILLOT ET AL., "Natural Genetic Exchanges between Vaccine and Wild Poliovirus Strains in Humans", J. VIROL., (2000), vol. 74, pages 8434 - 8443 | - LIU ET AL., "Molecular Evolution of a Type 1 Wild-Vaccine Poliovirus Recombinant during Widespread Circulation in China", J. VIROL., (2000), vol. 74, pages 11153 - 11161 | - CHANG ET AL., "Nucleotide sequence variation of the envelope protein gene identifies two distinct genotypes of yellow fever virus", J. VIROL., (1995), vol. 69, pages 5773 - 5780 | - PISANO ET AL., "Complete nucleotide sequence and phylogeny of an American strain of yellow fever virus, TRINID79A", ARCH. VIROL., (1999), vol. 144, pages 1837 - 1843 | - CHANG ET AL., "Flavivirus DNA vaccines: current status and potential", ANN. NYACAD. SCI., (2001), vol. 951, pages 272 - 285 | - OBIJESKI ET AL., "Segmented genome and nucleocapsid of La Crosse virus", J. VIROL., (1976), vol. 20, pages 664 - 675 | - GADKARI ET AL., "Critical evaluation of Kyasanur Forest disease virus neutralizing antibodies found in bats (a preliminary report", INDIAN J. MED. RES., (1976), vol. 64, pages 64 - 67 | - KINNEY ET AL., "Construction of infectious cDNA clones for dengue 2 virus: strain 16681 and its attenuated vaccine derivative, strain PDK-53", VIROLOGY, (1997), vol. 230, pages 300 - 308 | - HUNT ET AL., "A recombinant particulate antigen of Japanese encephalitis virus produced in stably-transformed cells is an effective noninfectious antigen and subunit immunogen", J. VIROL. METHODS., (2001), vol. 97, pages 133 - 149 | - MURRAY ET AL., "Processing of the dengue virus type 2 proteins prM and C-prM", J. GEN. VIROL., (1993), vol. 74, no. 2, pages 175 - 182 | - ROEHRIG ET AL., "Monoclonal antibody mapping of the envelope glycoprotein of the dengue 2 virus, Jamaica", VIROLOGY, (1998), vol. 246, pages 317 - 328 | - HENCHAL ET AL., "Epitopic analysis of antigenic determinants on the surface of dengue-2 virions using monoclonal antibodies", AM. J. TROP. MED. HYG., (1985), vol. 34, pages 162 - 169 | - MANDL ET AL., "Antigenic structure of the flavivirus envelope protein E at the molecular level, using tick-borne encephalitis virus as a model", J. VIROL., (1989), vol. 63, pages 564 - 571 | - REY ET AL., "The envelope glycoprotein from tick-borne encephalitis virus at 2 A resolution", NATURE, (1995), vol. 375, pages 291 - 298 | - ALLISON ET AL., "Mapping of functional elements in the stem-anchor region of tick-borne encephalitis virus envelope protein E", J. VIROL., (1999), vol. 73, pages 5605 - 5612 | - ABERLE ET AL., "A DNA immunization model study with constructs expressing the tick-borne encephalitis virus envelope protein E in different physical forms", J. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 163, pages 6756 - 6761 | - ALLISON ET AL., "Synthesis and secretion of recombinant tick-borne encephalitis virus protein E in soluble and particulate form", J. VIROL., (1995), vol. 69, pages 5816 - 5820 | - GUIRAKHOO ET AL., "The Murray Valley encephalitis virus prM protein confers acid resistance to virus particles and alters the expression of epitopes within the R2 domain of E glycoprotein", VIROLOGY, (1992), vol. 191, pages 921 - 931 | - KOCHEL ET AL., "Inoculation of plasmids expressing the dengue-2 envelope gene elicit neutralizing antibodies in mice", VACCINE, (1997), vol. 15, pages 547 - 552 | - KONISHI ET AL., "A DNA vaccine expressing dengue type 2 virus premembrane and envelope genes induces neutralizing antibody and memory B cells in mice", VACCINE, (2000), vol. 18, pages 1133 - 1139 | - PORTER ET AL., "Protective efficacy of a dengue 2 DNA vaccine in mice and the effect of CpG immuno-stimulatory motifs on antibody responses", ARCH. VIROL., (1998), vol. 143, pages 997 - 1003 | - RAVIPRAKASH ET AL., "Synergistic Neutralizing Antibody Response to a Dengue Virus Type 2 DNA Vaccine by Incorporation of Lysosome-Associated Membrane Protein Sequences and Use of Plasmid Expressing GM-CSF", VIROLOGY, (2001), vol. 290, pages 74 - 82 | - MANDERS ET AL., "Immunology of DNA vaccines: CpG motifs and antigen presentation", INFLAMM. RES., (2000), vol. 49, pages 199 - 205 | - SMITH ET AL., "The regulation of DNA vaccines", CURR. OPIN. BIOTECH., (2001), vol. 12, pages 299 - 303 | - ROBERTSON ET AL., "Assuring the quality, safety, and efficacy of DNA vaccines", MOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2001), vol. 17, pages 143 - 149 | - RODRIGUEZ ET AL., "Enhancing DNA immunization", VIROLOGY, (2000), vol. 268, pages 233 - 238 |