EP1975029 - Device and method for automatic speed regulation of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astrium GmbH 81663 München / DE | [2008/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trautenberg, Hans L. Dr. Robert Koch Strasse 13d 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [2008/40] | Representative(s) | Hummel, Adam Airbus Defence and Space GmbH Patentabteilung 81663 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Hummel, Adam EADS Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung 81663 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08004256.7 | 07.03.2008 | [2008/40] | Priority number, date | DE20071015303 | 27.03.2007 Original published format: DE102007015303 | [2008/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1975029 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/14 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
B60W30/146 (EP,US);
B60W2552/15 (EP,US);
B60W2552/20 (EP,US);
B60W2555/60 (EP,US);
B60W2556/50 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US);
Y02T10/84 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/24] |
Former [2008/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur automatischen Geschwindigkeitsregelung eines Fahrzeugs | [2008/40] | English: | Device and method for automatic speed regulation of a vehicle | [2008/40] | French: | Dispositif et procédé destinés au réglage automatique de la vitesse d'un véhicule | [2008/40] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 02.04.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/13] | 02.11.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.12.2011 | 08.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/13] | 06.12.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19821585 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A]US6161072 (CLAPPER EDWARD O [US]) [A] 1,2,8,9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1505555 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] , [0025] , [0026]; claims 1-3,9-11 *; | [X]DE10358968 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,5,8,9,11,14,15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0020] *; | [A]DE102004040208 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,8,9 * paragraphs [0015] , [0047] , [0049] , [0052] , [0053] *; | [A]DE202006007858U (KOCH DIETER [DE]); | [A]EP1439976 (VOLVO LASTVAGNAR AB [SE]) [A] 1-4,8-10 * paragraph [0028]; claim 1 * | by applicant | EP1505555 | DE10358968 | EP1439976 |