EP2100693 - Processing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2016 | Revocation of patent | published on 19.10.2016 [2016/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weeke Bohrsysteme GmbH Benzstrasse 10-16 33442 Herzebrock-Clarholz / DE | [2009/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heimann, Reinhard Ossietzkystrasse 57 33332 Gütersloh / DE | 02 /
Brinkhaus, Werner Peitzmeierweg 9 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | [2009/38] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/38] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08004574.3 | 12.03.2008 | [2009/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2100693 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2100693 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q1/01 | [2009/38] | CPC: |
B23Q1/015 (EP,US);
Y10T156/10 (EP,US);
Y10T156/17 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/38] | Title | German: | Bearbeitungsvorrichtung | [2009/38] | English: | Processing device | [2009/38] | French: | Dispositif de traitement | [2009/38] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 05.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.06.2012
14.06.2012
ADMISSIBLE Otto Martin Maschinenbau GmbH & Co. KG Langenberger Strasse 6 87724 Ottobeuren / DE Opponent's representative Ernicke, Klaus Stefan, et al, et al Ernicke & Ernicke Beim Glaspalast 1 86153 Augsburg / DE | 02
14.06.2012
25.06.2012
ADMISSIBLE Max Bögl Bauunternehmung GmbH & Co. KG Max-Bögl-Strasse 1 92369 Sengenthal / DE Opponent's representative Bergmeier, Werner, et al, et al Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Friedrich-Ebert-Straße 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | 03
14.06.2012
25.06.2012
ADMISSIBLE BIESSE S.p.A. Via della Meccanica, 16 61100 Pesaro / IT Opponent's representative Manconi, Stefano, et al, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.06.2012
14.06.2012
ADMISSIBLE Otto Martin Maschinenbau GmbH & Co. KG Langenberger Strasse 6 87724 Ottobeuren / DE Opponent's representative Ernicke, Klaus Stefan, et al, et al Patentanwälte Ernicke & Ernicke, Schwibbogenplatz 2b 86153 Augsburg / DE | ||
02
14.06.2012
ADMISSIBLE Max Bögl Bauunternehmung GmbH & Co. KG Max-Bögl-Strasse 1 92369 Sengenthal / DE Opponent's representative Bergmeier, Werner, et al, et al Canzler & Bergmeier Friedrich-Ebert-Straße 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | |||
03
14.06.2012
ADMISSIBLE BIESSE S.p.A. Via della Meccanica, 16 61100 Pesaro / IT Opponent's representative Manconi, Stefano, et al, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | |||
Former [2012/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.06.2012
Otto Martin Maschinenbau GmbH & Co. KG Langenberger Strasse 6 87724 Ottobeuren / DE Opponent's representative Ernicke, Klaus Stefan, et al, et al Patentanwälte Ernicke & Ernicke, Schwibbogenplatz 2b 86153 Augsburg / DE | 19.07.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.11.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.11.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 09.09.2016 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/42] | Appeal following opposition | 03.02.2014 | Appeal received No. T0262/14 | 07.04.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.08.2016 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2016/32] | 09.09.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.03.2008 | CY | 14.09.2011 | CZ | 14.09.2011 | DK | 14.09.2011 | EE | 14.09.2011 | FI | 14.09.2011 | HR | 14.09.2011 | IE | 14.09.2011 | LT | 14.09.2011 | LV | 14.09.2011 | MT | 14.09.2011 | NL | 14.09.2011 | RO | 14.09.2011 | SE | 14.09.2011 | SI | 14.09.2011 | SK | 14.09.2011 | TR | 14.09.2011 | BG | 14.12.2011 | NO | 14.12.2011 | GR | 15.12.2011 | IS | 14.01.2012 | PT | 16.01.2012 | GB | 12.03.2012 | LU | 12.03.2012 | BE | 31.03.2012 | CH | 31.03.2012 | LI | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | AT | 12.03.2013 | IT | 12.03.2015 | PL | 12.03.2015 | ES | 13.03.2015 | FR | 31.03.2015 | DE | 01.10.2015 | [2016/35] |
Former [2016/25] | HU | 12.03.2008 | |
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
MT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
TR | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
GB | 12.03.2012 | ||
LU | 12.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
AT | 12.03.2013 | ||
IT | 12.03.2015 | ||
PL | 12.03.2015 | ||
FR | 31.03.2015 | ||
DE | 01.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | HU | 12.03.2008 | |
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
MT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
TR | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
GB | 12.03.2012 | ||
LU | 12.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
AT | 12.03.2013 | ||
IT | 12.03.2015 | ||
FR | 31.03.2015 | ||
DE | 01.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | HU | 12.03.2008 | |
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
MT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
TR | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
GB | 12.03.2012 | ||
LU | 12.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
AT | 12.03.2013 | ||
IT | 12.03.2015 | ||
DE | 01.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | HU | 12.03.2008 | |
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
MT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
TR | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
GB | 12.03.2012 | ||
LU | 12.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
AT | 12.03.2013 | ||
IT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2014/37] | HU | 12.03.2008 | |
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
MT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
TR | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
GB | 12.03.2012 | ||
LU | 12.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
AT | 12.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | HU | 12.03.2008 | |
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
MT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
TR | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
GB | 12.03.2012 | ||
LU | 12.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
MT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
TR | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
GB | 12.03.2012 | ||
LU | 12.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
MT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
TR | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
GB | 12.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
MT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
GB | 12.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
GB | 12.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3800636 (ZAGAR F) [X] 1-4 * figures 10,11 * [Y] 5-9; | [XY]DE2521036 (DECKEL AG FRIEDRICH) [X] 10 * figure 2 * [Y] 5-9; | [Y]GB1556941 (STUDER AG FRITZ) [Y] 9 * figure 2 *; | [X]EP0194173 (CECMO SA [FR]) [X] 1* figures 5,6 * | by applicant | DE202006019323U |