EP2000536 - Tat-derived transport polypeptides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biogen Idec MA Inc. 14 Cambridge Center Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | For all designated states Biogen Idec MA, Inc. 14 Cambridge Center Cambridge Massachusetts 02142 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barsoum, James G. 9 Marlboro Road Lexington, MA 02173 / US | 02 /
Fawell, Stephen E. 21 Lantern Road Framingham, Massachusetts 01702 / US | 03 /
Pepinsky, R. Blake 30 Falmouth Road Arlington, MA 02174 / US | [2009/26] |
Former [2008/50] | 01 /
Barsoum, James G. 9 Marlboro Road Lexington, MA 02173 / US | ||
02 /
Fawell, Stephen E. 1 Black Horse Terrace Winchester, MA 01890 / US | |||
03 /
Pepinsky, R. Blake 30 Falmouth Road Arlington, MA 02174 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08004968.7 | 19.08.1993 | [2008/50] | Priority number, date | US19920934375 | 21.08.1992 Original published format: US 934375 | [2008/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2000536 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2000536 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/49, C12N15/87, C12N15/37, C12N15/62, C12N15/31, C12N9/02, C12N9/22, A61K39/21, C07K14/16, C12N5/10, C12N1/11 | [2008/50] | CPC: |
C12N15/87 (EP);
A61K47/62 (EP);
A61K49/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP);
C07K14/21 (EP);
C07K14/47 (EP);
C12N9/0065 (EP);
C12N9/22 (EP);
C12Y111/01007 (EP);
A61K2123/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP);
C07K2319/10 (EP);
C07K2319/55 (EP);
C07K2319/71 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2008/50] | Title | German: | TAT-abgeleitete Transportpolypeptide | [2008/50] | English: | Tat-derived transport polypeptides | [2008/50] | French: | Polypeptides de transport à dérivés de tat | [2008/50] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 17.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 07.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/29] | 08.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/29] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93920231.3 / EP0656950 | EP98105625.2 / EP0903408 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19930920231) is 09.08.1996 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9109958 (WHITEHEAD BIOMEDICAL INST [US], et al); | by applicant | WO9109958 | US5219990 | US19920934375 |