EP1983229 - Control system for automatic vehicle transmissions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Giken Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1 Minami-Aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kon, Takanori c/o K.K. Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Inagawa, Yasushi c/o K.K. Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 03 /
Saito, Yoshiharu c/o K.K. Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 04 /
Fukuchi, Masamitsu c/o K.K. Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 05 /
Majikina, Shinya c/o K.K. Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | [2008/43] | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg, et al C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Prechtel, Jörg, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08005485.1 | 08.12.2000 | [2008/43] | Priority number, date | JP19990350890 | 09.12.1999 Original published format: JP 35089099 | JP19990350891 | 09.12.1999 Original published format: JP 35089199 | [2008/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1983229 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1983229 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | [2009/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1983229 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/06, // F16H59/14, F16H59/42, F16H59/68 | [2008/43] | CPC: |
F16H61/061 (EP,US);
F16H2059/147 (EP,US);
F16H2059/683 (EP,US);
F16H2342/044 (EP,US);
F16H59/72 (EP,US);
F16H61/682 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/43] | Title | German: | Steuersystem für automatische Fahrzeuggetriebe | [2008/43] | English: | Control system for automatic vehicle transmissions | [2008/43] | French: | Système de contrôle pour transmissions de véhicule automatique | [2008/43] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 06.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00127010.7 / EP1106876 | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5967942 (YUASA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 67; figures 1,2,5 *; | [A]DE19756844 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 4, line 32 - column 5, line 38; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE19756844 | US5967942 |