EP1974774 - Device to prevent the spread of explosions, in particular dust explosions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rembe GmbH Safety + Control Gallbergweg 21 59929 Brilon / DE | [2008/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Penno, Bernhard Mühlenweg 61 59929 Brilon / DE | [2008/40] | Representative(s) | Graefe, Jörg, et al Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 1580 59705 Arnsberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Graefe, Jörg, et al Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ostentor 9 59757 Arnsberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08005566.8 | 26.03.2008 | [2008/40] | Priority number, date | DE20071014908 | 26.03.2007 Original published format: DE102007014908 | [2008/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1974774 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A62C3/04, A62C35/11, A62C37/10 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
A62C3/04 (EP);
A62C37/10 (EP);
A62C35/11 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/40] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung gegen die Ausbreitung von Explosionen, insbesondere Staubexplosionen | [2008/40] | English: | Device to prevent the spread of explosions, in particular dust explosions | [2008/40] | French: | Dispositif contre la propagation d'explosions, en particulier d'explosions de poussière | [2008/40] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 04.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/20] | 22.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3140375 (RUHRKOHLE AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,15-17,22,26-28 * the whole document * [A] 3-5,7-14,18,20,21,23-25; | [A]US5934381 (LARSEN THEODORE E [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1-4 *; | [DA]DE2347870 (PRB SA) [DA] 1 * pages 1-3 * * figures 1-4 *; | [DA]DE10016738 (BAYERN CHEMIE GMBH FLUGCHEMIE [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE10016738 | DE3850438T | DE2347870 |