EP1986070 - Clock signal generation circuit and semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | 28.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | [2013/17] |
Former [2008/44] | For all designated states SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO., LTD. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Endo, Masami c/o Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | [2013/17] |
Former [2008/44] | 01 /
Endo, Masami c/o Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08005881.1 | 27.03.2008 | [2008/44] | Priority number, date | JP20070117849 | 27.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007117849 | [2008/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1986070 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1986070 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | [2011/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1986070 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/04 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
G06F1/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL [2011/45] |
Former [2008/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schaltkreis zur Erzeugung eines Taktsignals und Halbleitervorrichtung | [2008/44] | English: | Clock signal generation circuit and semiconductor device | [2008/44] | French: | Circuit de génération de signal d'horloge et dispositif semi-conducteur | [2008/44] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 03.09.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.10.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 24.04.2013 | NL | 24.04.2013 | [2014/14] |
Former [2013/49] | FI | 24.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003204766 (AKASAKA NOBUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [I]US2004264620 (TANAKA NOBUYUKI [JP]) [I] 1-13 * figures 1,3,4 * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0074] * | by applicant | JPH11225091 | JP2007117849 |