EP2027866 - Methods for preventing reovirus recognition for the treatment of cellular proliferative disorders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oncolytics Biotech Inc. Suite 210 1167 Kensington Crescent N. W. Calgary, AB T2N 1X7 / CA | [2009/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coffey, Matthew 2231 Bowness Road, N.W. Calgary, Alberta T2N 3L4 / CA | 02 /
Thompson, Bradley 1775 7th Avenue, N.W. Calgary, Alberta T2N 0Z5 / CA | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [2014/01] |
Former [2009/09] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08006359.7 | 20.07.2001 | [2009/09] | Priority number, date | US20000636597 | 10.08.2000 Original published format: US 636597 | [2009/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2027866 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/76, A61P35/00 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
A61K35/765 (EP,US);
A61K38/13 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
C07K16/081 (EP,US);
C07K16/10 (EP,US);
C07K16/4216 (EP,US);
C12N9/1205 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K35/765, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/13, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2009/09] | Title | German: | Methoden zur Prävention der Reovirus-Erkennung zur Behandlung von zellulären proliferativen Erkrankungen | [2009/09] | English: | Methods for preventing reovirus recognition for the treatment of cellular proliferative disorders | [2009/09] | French: | Méthodes pour la prévention de la reconnaissance du réovirus pour le traitement des maladies cellulaires prolifératives | [2009/09] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 01.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/16] | 06.03.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.04.2015 | 14.04.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01953727.3 / EP1309334 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010953727) is 17.09.2003 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]WO9908692 (LEE PATRICK W K [CA], et al); | by applicant | WO9908692 |