EP2009539 - Power gating for multimedia processing power management [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.03.2013 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 01.05.2013 [2013/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2009/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Subramaniam, Vijay c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2009/01] | Representative(s) | Heselberger, Johannes, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | Heselberger, Johannes, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08006416.5 | 31.03.2008 | [2009/01] | Priority number, date | US20070769596 | 27.06.2007 Original published format: US 769596 | [2009/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2009539 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2009539 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/32 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
G06F1/3203 (EP,US);
G06F1/3287 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US);
Y02D30/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/01] | Title | German: | Strom-Torschaltung für Multimedia-Verarbeitungsleistungsverwaltung | [2009/01] | English: | Power gating for multimedia processing power management | [2009/01] | French: | Commutation d'alimentation pour la gestion de la consommation d'énergie d'un processeur multimédia | [2009/01] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 09.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/18] | 05.07.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/18] | 10.12.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP12174767.9 / EP2508962 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003037221 (GSCHWIND MICHAEL KARL [US], et al) [A] 1-50 * abstract * * paragraph [0032] *; | [A]US2004070427 (MIYAGI SATORU [JP]) [A] 1-50 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] *; | [I]US2005276132 (SEVERSON MATTHEW L [US], et al) [I] 1-50 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0026] , [0029] , [0030] , [0038] , [0059] *; | [A]US2006206737 (LEE HOI-JIN [KR]) [A] 1-50 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0011]; claim 1 *; | [A]US2006282826 (DOCKSER KENNETH A [US]) [A] 1-50 * abstract ** paragraphs [0038] , [0039] *; | [A] - CALHOUN B H ET AL, "Design methodology for fine-grained leakage control in MTCMOS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2003 INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON LOW POWER ELECTRONICS AND DESIGN. ISLPED'03. SEOUL, KOREA, AUG. 25 - 27, 2003; [INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON LOW POWER ELCTRONICS AND DESIGN], NEW YORK, NY : ACM, US, (20030825), ISBN 978-1-58113-682-1, pages 104 - 109, XP010658596 [A] 1-50 * the whole document * | Examination | US5615376 | WO0022501 | - IKEDO T, "A SCALABLE HIGHPERFORMANCE GRAPHICS PROCESSOR : GVIP", VISUAL COMPUTER, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (19950101), vol. 11, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S003710050008, ISSN 0178-2789, pages 121 - 133, XP000675017 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s003710050008 | by applicant | US2005276132 |