EP1947899 - Communication system for interactive services with a packet switching interaction channel over a narrow-band circuit switching network, as well as a device for application in such a communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke KPN N.V. Maanplein 55 2516 CK The Hague / NL | [2008/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klok, Frederic Harm Pondstraat 13 2645 GZ Delfgauw / NL | 02 /
Dirksen, Mark Johannes Gerardus Haverdijk 64 4841 AS Prinsenbeek / NL | 03 /
Koster, Arian Rietveld 20 3641 GS Mijdrecht / NL | [2008/30] | Representative(s) | Wuyts, Koenraad Maria Koninklijke KPN N.V. Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 25110 3001 HC Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Wuyts, Koenraad Maria Koninklijke KPN N.V., Intellectual Property Group, P.O. Box 95321 2509 CH Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2008/30] | Wuyts, Koenraad Maria Koninklijke KPN N.V., P.O. Box 95321 2509 CH Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 08006668.1 | 09.09.1996 | [2008/30] | Priority number, date | NL19951001162 | 08.09.1995 Original published format: NL 1001162 | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1947899 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04, H04M11/00 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2008/30] | Title | German: | Kommunikationssystem für interaktive Dienste mit einem Paketvermittlungsinteraktionskanal über ein Schmalband-Leitungsvermittlungsnetzwerk sowie eine Vorrichtung zur Anwendung in einem derartigen Kommunikationssystem | [2008/30] | English: | Communication system for interactive services with a packet switching interaction channel over a narrow-band circuit switching network, as well as a device for application in such a communication system | [2008/30] | French: | Système de communication pour services interactifs avec un canal d'interaction de commutation de paquets sur un réseau de commutation de circuit à bande étroite, ainsi qu'un dispositif pour une application dans un tel système de communication | [2008/30] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 19.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/40] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07006827.5 / EP1814352 | EP96202496.4 / EP0763960 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 01.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4713837 (GORDON ALASTAIR [CA]) [X] 1-21 * column 2, line 52 - column 4, line 9 * * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 34 * * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 36 *; | [A]EP0418812 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-21 * column 1, line 17 - column 5, line 30 *; | [A]WO9117618 (ALPHANET TELECOM INC [CA]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]EP0631412 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 7 * * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X] - JO K Y ET AL, "Global Command and Control System target architecture modeling", MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, 1994. MILCOM '94. CONFERENCE RECOR D, 1994 IEEE FORT MONMOUTH, NJ, USA 2-5 OCT. 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19941002), ISBN 978-0-7803-1828-1, pages 479 - 484, XP010149842 [X] 1,9-12,17-21 * paragraphs [002.] - [3.2.] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MILCOM.1994.473994 | [A] - H. KATZ ET AL., "Teleaction Services: Standards and Architectures", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, US, (199406), vol. 32, no. 6, pages 54 - 65, XP000465910 [A] 1-21 * par.: Reference Physical Architecture,; page 55, column L * * par: Provision of Teleaction Services in an ISDN Environment; page 57, column L - column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/35.286509 | by applicant | US4713837 | EP0418812 | GB2280337 | GB2282027 | EP0690653 | EP0722237 |