EP2106829 - Set of collectible items [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PlayPeople ApS Vester Farimagsgade 41 1606 Copenhagen V / DK | [2009/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rosendahl, Jun Christian Mogi N.J. Fjords Allé 16, 3. tv. 1957 Frederiksberg / DK | 02 /
Ho̸rslev-Petersen, Rune Zinnsgade 6, 3. th. 2100 Copenhagen V. / DK | [2009/41] | Representative(s) | Dragsted, Helle Rude, et al Chas. Hude A/S H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 DK-1780 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2009/41] | Dragsted, Helle Rude, et al Chas. Hude A/S H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 1780 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 08006862.0 | 04.04.2008 | [2009/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2106829 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A63F1/00 | [2009/41] | CPC: |
A63F1/02 (EP);
A63F2009/2439 (EP);
A63F2011/0065 (EP);
A63F2011/0072 (EP);
A63F3/0665 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/24] |
Former [2009/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sammelstücksatz | [2009/41] | English: | Set of collectible items | [2009/41] | French: | Ensemble d'éléments à collectionner | [2009/41] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/42] | 19.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0201494 (UPPER DECK COMPANY LLC [US]) [X] 1,8-21 * page 5 - page 11; figure - * [Y] 2-7; | [Y]US5439232 (POLLOCK JOHN S [US]) [Y] 2-7 * column 3, line 13 - line 41 * * column 6, line 18 - line 20; figure - *; | [X]US2002020966 (TANAKA TOKIO [JP]) [X] 22 * figures 1,3,7; claim 1 * | by applicant | US6612501 |