EP2108702 - Synthesis of polyunsaturated fatty acids in yeast [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Organo Balance GmbH Gustav-Meyer-Allee 25 13355 Berlin / DE | [2009/42] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08006915.6 | 07.04.2008 | [2009/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2108702 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/64, C12N1/18, A23L1/30, A23K1/16 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
C12P7/6472 (EP,US);
A23K20/158 (EP);
A23L33/12 (EP);
C11B1/10 (EP);
C12N1/18 (EP);
C12N9/0083 (EP);
C12N9/1029 (EP);
C12P7/6427 (EP,US);
C12P7/6431 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Synthese mehrfach ungesättigter Fettsäuren in Hefe | [2009/42] | English: | Synthesis of polyunsaturated fatty acids in yeast | [2009/42] | French: | Synthèse d'acides gras polyinsaturés dans la levure | [2009/42] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2010/10] | 01.11.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0012720 (ABBOTT LAB [US]); | [XY]EP1557471 (CONSEJO SUPERIOR INVESTIGACION [ES]); | [XY]US2006051847 (GUNNARSSON NINA K [DK], et al); | [XY]WO2008000277 (FLUXOME SCIENCES AS [DK], et al); | by applicant | EP0300168 |