EP1986280 - Device for receiving connectors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CCS Technology, Inc. 103 Foulk Road Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | [2008/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Froehlich, Franz-Friedrich, Dipl.-Ing Zum Hohenhof 11C 58091 Hagen / DE | 02 /
Fabrykowski, Grzegorz Michalówek 8 95-010 Stryków / PL | [2008/44] | Representative(s) | Sturm, Christoph, et al Quermann - Sturm - Weilnau Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Sturm, Christoph, et al Quermann Sturm GbR Patentanwälte Unter den Eichen 7 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 08006941.2 | 08.04.2008 | [2008/44] | Priority number, date | DE20072005870U | 23.04.2007 Original published format: DE 202007005870 U | [2008/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1986280 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1986280 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | [2009/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/518, G02B6/38 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
G02B6/3897 (EP);
H01R13/518 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/44] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Aufnahme von Steckverbindungen | [2008/44] | English: | Device for receiving connectors | [2008/44] | French: | Dispositif destiné à recevoir des connexions enfichables | [2008/44] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/22] | 05.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/12] | 06.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3199068 (NEENAN CHARLES J) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [XA]EP0913883 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * [A] 7; | [XA]WO0028363 (RAYCHEM SA NV [BE], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * page 8, line 29 - page 9, line 3 * * figures 1-10e * [A] 7; | [XA]US2003048999 (IMABAYASHI HIROFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * [A] 7; | [XA]US2006228940 (FOLLINGSTAD MICHAEL J [US]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0036] * * figures 1-11 * [A] 7 | by applicant | EP0913883 | WO0028363 | US2003048999 | US2006228940 |