EP1981002 - On-vehicle data collection apparatus, center and on-vehicle system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/42] | On-vehicle data collection apparatus, centre and on-vehicle system | ||
[2008/50] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | For all designated states Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Mitsuo c/o Denso Corporation I.P.D. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-Pref., 448-8661 / JP | [2008/42] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 08007117.8 | 10.04.2008 | [2008/42] | Priority number, date | JP20070105700 | 13.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007105700 | [2008/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1981002 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1981002 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G07C5/00 | [2008/42] | CPC: |
G07C5/008 (EP,US);
G07C5/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2011/02] |
Former [2008/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bordeigene Fahrzeugdatenerfassungsvorrichtung, Zentrale und bordeigenes System | [2008/42] | English: | On-vehicle data collection apparatus, center and on-vehicle system | [2008/50] | French: | Appareil de collecte de données sur véhicule, centre, et système embarqué | [2008/42] |
Former [2008/42] | On-vehicle data collection apparatus, centre and on-vehicle system | Examination procedure | 06.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/18] | 14.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9803952 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [Y] 12 * page 17, line 28 - line 39 * * table II *; | [A]US5848365 (COVERDILL CARY N [US]) [A] 13-15 * figure 1 * * column 6, line 40 - line 57 ** column 8, line 18 - column 9, line 61 *; | [XY]DE19847622 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * claims 1, 2, 10 * * figure 1 * * column 3, line 62 - line 66 * * column 6, line 30 - line 36 * * column 7, line 15 - line 24 * * column 7, line 44 - line 49 * * column 8, line 44 - line 57 * [Y] 4-6,11-12,15; | [Y]US6225898 (KAMIYA KENJI [JP], et al) [Y] 6-8,10 * figures 1,16 *; | [Y]DE10029401 (MUNNIX PASCAL [DE]) [Y] 13-15 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0068] *; | [Y]US2003050747 (KAMIYA KENJI [JP]) [Y] 9 * claim 16 * * paragraph [0062] *; | [Y]GB2388666 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [Y] 2-3 * claims 10-12, 15 *; | [Y]DE10348743 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 11 * claim 3 * * figure 2 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] *; | [XY]WO2005064546 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [X] 1 * claims 1-3,5,8 * * page 11, line 26 - line 31 * * page 14, line 32 - page 15, line 4 * [Y] 2-10,13-14; | [XP]WO2007123602 (SNAP ON TOOLS CORP [US], et al) [XP] 1 * claim 1 * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0042] * | by applicant | JPH09126954 |