EP2011923 - Vehicle speed reducing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kelly, Alan 15 Woodbrook Square Castleknock Dublin 15 / IE | [2009/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Armstrong, Rosemary Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Armstrong, Rosemary Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 08007183.0 | 11.04.2008 | [2009/02] | Priority number, date | GB20070007164 | 13.04.2007 Original published format: GB 0707164 | [2009/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2011923 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2011923 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E01F9/07, E01F9/047, E01F13/12 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
E01F13/123 (EP);
E01F9/529 (EP,GB);
E01F9/565 (EP);
G08G1/052 (EP,GB)
| Designated contracting states | [2011/17] |
Former [2009/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Geschwindigkeitsreduktionsvorrichtung für ein Fahrzeug | [2009/02] | English: | Vehicle speed reducing device | [2009/02] | French: | Dispositif de réduction de la vitesse d'un véhicule | [2009/02] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 07.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 19.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/38] | 30.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/38] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 04.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 04.07.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 04.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 04.07.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR2622034 (MASAIR [FR]); | [A]FR2647132 (CHARBONNIER JACQUES [FR]); | [XI]GB2304769 (TRIGGS DAVID MARTIN [GB]); | [XAI]GB2428067 (SHAW STEPHEN [GB]) |