EP2108882 - Method and device for lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhejiang Howell Illuminating Technology Co., Ltd. Yianxiang Industrial Estate Lanjiang Street Yuyao Zhejiang / CN | [2009/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Su, Jianli Xiaxiang Industrial Estate Lanjiang Street Yuyao Zhejiang / CN | [2009/42] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08007193.9 | 11.04.2008 | [2009/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2108882 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/08, F21K7/00 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
F21S8/086 (EP,US);
F21W2131/103 (EP);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für Lampe | [2009/42] | English: | Method and device for lamp | [2009/42] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour lampe | [2009/42] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/21] | 21.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/16] | 03.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1431653 (TOSHIJI KISHIMURA [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0039]; figures 5-8 *; | [Y]WO9833007 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1,2 * page 1, line 20 - page 11, line 7 * |