EP1980908 - Use of silver halide photographic material and image forming method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/42] | Silver halide photographic material and image forming method using the same | ||
[2010/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2012 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miki, Masaaki c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 210, Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Shirai, Hideyuki c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 210, Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Hosokawa, Junichiro c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 210, Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Kikuchi, Tetsuo c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 210, Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 05 /
Hosoya, Yoichi c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 210, Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 06 /
Nukui, Katsuyuki c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 210, Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 07 /
Nishimura, Ryoji c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 210, Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 08 /
Yokota, Kouichi c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 210, Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | [2011/36] |
Former [2008/42] | 01 /
Miki, Masaaki c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 210, Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | ||
02 /
Shirai, Hideyuki c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 210, Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | |||
03 /
Hosokawa, Junichiro c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 210, Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | |||
04 /
Kikuchi, Tetsuo c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 210, Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | |||
05 /
Hosoya, Yoichi c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 210, Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | |||
06 /
Nukui, Katsuyuki c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 210, Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | |||
07 /
Nishimura, Ryoji c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 210, Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | |||
08 /
Yokota, Kouichi c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 210, Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/42] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08007244.0 | 11.04.2008 | [2008/42] | Priority number, date | JP20070106169 | 13.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007106169 | [2008/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1980908 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1980908 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/30, G03C1/29 | [2008/42] | CPC: |
G03C7/3029 (EP,US);
G03C1/29 (EP,US);
G03C1/10 (EP,US);
G03C1/16 (EP,US);
G03C1/18 (EP,US);
G03C2001/03594 (EP);
G03C2200/22 (EP);
G03C2200/24 (EP);
G03C2200/35 (EP);
| C-Set: |
G03C1/10, G03C2200/24, G03C1/10 (EP,US);
G03C7/3022, G03C2001/03594 (US,EP);
G03C7/3029, G03C2200/22, G03C2200/35 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/26] |
Former [2008/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einsatz von photographischen Silberhalogenidmaterial und Bilderzeugungsverfahren | [2010/52] | English: | Use of silver halide photographic material and image forming method | [2010/52] | French: | Utilisation de matériau photographique à l' halogénure d' argent et procédé de formation d' image | [2010/52] |
Former [2008/42] | Photographisches Silberhalogenidmaterial und Bilderzeugungsverfahren, bei dem dieses Material zum Einsatz kommt | ||
Former [2008/42] | Silver halide photographic material and image forming method using the same | ||
Former [2008/42] | Matériau photographique à l'halogénure d'argent et procédé de formation d'image l'utilisant | Examination procedure | 15.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 16.04.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.05.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.11.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 04.11.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.11.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.04.2012 | [2013/13] | Documents cited: | Search | [DXY]JPH07128791 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [DX] 1,4-8 * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] , [0025] , [0030] , [0039] , [0041] , [0047] , [0060] , [0066] - [0069] - [0077] , [0085] , [0092] , [0118]; claim 3 * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]JPH02181140 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [Y] 2 * page 7; examples I.1,I.2,I.5,I.6 * * page 8 * * page 9; examples I.27-I.30 * * page 10; examples II.2,II.3,II.6,II.9 * * page 11; examples II.13-II.15,II.17 * * page 12, lines II.31,II.35 * * page 13, column R, line 8 - line 11 * * page 15, column R, line 11 - line 13 * * page 15, column R, line 26 * * page 18, column L, line 7 - line 9 * * page 19, column L, line 22 - line 40 * * page 19, column R, line 21 - line 22 * * page 26 - page 28 *; | [Y]FR2238168 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 2 * page 1, line 1 - line 5 * * page 9, line 1 - line 9 * * page 10 - page 12 * * page 14; example II.10 * * page 15; example II.11 * * page 16; examples II.18,II.19 * * page 20, line 27 - line 32 * * page 21, line 9 * * page 22; example 7 * * claim 1 *; | [Y]EP1227365 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [Y] 3 * page 28, line 47 - line 53 * * page 32, line 18 - line 45 * * page 39; example MC.1 * * page 45; example GSD.1 * * claim 1 * | by applicant | JPH07128791 | WO8804794 | JPH01502912 | EP0456148 | JPH05188548 | US3337344 | US3418129 | US3892572 | US4138258 | US4451559 | GB1494777 | JPH05323487 | JPS63264740 | JPS59133542 | US2642361 | US3297446 | US3772031 | US3857711 | US3901714 | US4266018 | US3904415 | GB1315755 | US3503749 | US5049484 | US5049485 | US5252455 | US5391727 | US5620841 | US5700631 | US5759760 | US5759761 | US5912111 | US5912112 | US5939245 | JPH01147537 | JPH0869074 | JPH0869075 | JPH09269554 | JPS4529274B | DD264524 | DD264525 | DD265474 | DD298321 | JP2001075214 | JP2001075215 | JP2001075216 | JP2001075217 | JP2001075218 | JPS4313489B | JPS4415748B | JPH0425832 | JPH04109340 | JPH04271341 | JPH0540324 | JPH0511385 | JPH0651415 | JPH06175258 | JPH06180478 | JPH06208186 | JPH06208194 | JPH06317867 | JPH0792599 | JPH0798483 | JPH07140579 | US3628969 | US4225666 | JPS58113928 | US4183756 | - Kozo Kassei Sokan Kondankai (Social Gathering of Correlation of Structure and Activity), NANKODO CO., LTD., (1979), pages 43 - 203 | - T.H. JAMES, The Theory of the Photographic Process, MACMILLAN, (1977), pages 67 - 76 | - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, (197404), vol. 120, page 12008 | - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, (197506), vol. 34, page 13452 |