EP1946937 - Composite recording medium and manufacturing method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Onishi, Hiroyuki c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
Sibatani, Masaya c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | 03 /
Hanmura, Masahiro c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | 04 /
Kanada, Hidemasa c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | [2008/30] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08007574.0 | 13.11.2000 | [2008/30] | Priority number, date | JP19990323356 | 12.11.1999 Original published format: JP 32335699 | JP20000276063 | 12.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000276063 | JP20000336688 | 02.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000336688 | JP20000344380 | 10.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000344380 | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1946937 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00, B41J11/42, B41J11/00 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
G03G7/00 (EP);
B41J11/008 (EP);
B41J11/42 (EP);
B41M5/506 (EP);
B41M5/52 (EP);
G03G5/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2008/30] | Title | German: | Verbundaufzeichnungsmedium und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2008/30] | English: | Composite recording medium and manufacturing method therefor | [2008/30] | French: | Support d'enregistrement composite et son procédé de fabrication | [2008/30] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 25.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/52] | 04.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/52] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00124756.8 / EP1099563 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH082089 ; | [A]GB1300319 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * page 4, line 53 - line 65 * * page 7, line 47 - line 48 ** page 9, line 85 - line 90 *; | [A]EP0742107 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 3, line 1 - line 22 * * page 3, line 51 - page 4, line 4 *; | [A]EP0791474 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * page 4, line 39 - line 59 * * page 5, line 48 - line 58 * * page 7, line 44 *; | [A]EP0826510 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 2, line 57 - page 3, line 6 * * page 4, line 12 - line 23 * * page 5, line 11 - line 27 * * page 5, line 52 - page 6, line 35 *; | [A]EP0943450 (TOMOEGAWA PAPER CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 2, line 45 - page 3, line 38 * * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 13 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 1996, no. 05, & JP08002089 A 19960109 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0013] , [0016] , [0024] , [0035] , [0036] , [0042] * | by applicant | JPH0117246 | JPH07276789 | JPH08174992 | JPH1081064 | JPH10119423 | JPH10119424 | JPH10175365 | JPH10193776 | JPH10203006 | JPH10217601 | JPH1120300 | JPH1120306 | JPH1158942 | JPH11115308 | JPH11188966 |