EP2015534 - DVB receiver with diversity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alps Electric Co., Ltd. 1-7 Yukigaya-Otsuka-cho, Ota-ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oyama, Toru c/o ALPS Electric Co., Ltd. 1-7 Yukigaya, Otsuka-cho, Ota-ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Ryoichi c/o ALPS Electric Co., Ltd. 1-7 Yukigaya, Otsuka-cho, Ota-ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | 03 /
Yamamoto, Hiromi c/o ALPS Electric Co., Ltd. 1-7 Yukigaya, Otsuka-cho, Ota-ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08007596.3 | 18.04.2008 | [2009/03] | Priority number, date | JP20070161013 | 19.06.2007 Original published format: JP 2007161013 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2015534 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2015534 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26, H04L27/00, H04L25/02, H01Q1/24 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
H04L27/2647 (EP);
H01Q1/1271 (EP);
H01Q9/285 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/03] | H04L27/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DVB-Empfänger mit Diversität | [2009/03] | English: | DVB receiver with diversity | [2009/03] | French: | Récepteur DVB à diversité | [2009/03] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IDY]JP2005167890 (ALPINE ELECTRONICS INC) [ID] 1,5 * abstract * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0039] * [Y] 2-4; | [Y]US5440319 (RAYMOND JOEL J [US], et al) [Y] 2,3 * abstract * * column 3, line 52 - column 3, line 53; figure 2 *; | [Y]US2002064238 (MATSUURA SYUUJI [JP]) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0025] *; | [A]EP1566934 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 5 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1760825 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 2,3,5 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 0008 - page 3, paragraph 0009 * | [Y] - STANGE L C ET AL, "Components of a highly integrated DBF terminal antenna for mobile Ka-band satellite communications", 2003 IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST.(IMS 2003). PHILADELPHIA, PA, JUNE 8 - 13, 2003;, (20030608), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7803-7695-3, pages 583 - 586, XP010644662 [Y] 2,3 * section II, 2nd par.; page 584 - page 584 * * section III, 3rd par.; page 584 - page 584 * * section IV, 1st par.; page 585 - page 585 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MWSYM.2003.1211006 | by applicant | JP2005167890 |