EP1985517 - Suspension for a bogie of a rail vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCT Europe Limited 3A Evans Business Centre Mitchelston Industrial Estate Kirkcaldy Fife KY1 3UF / GB | [2011/42] |
Former [2008/44] | For all designated states SCT Europe Limited 3A Evans Business Centre Mitchelston Industrial Estate Kirkaldy, Fife KY1 3UF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aitken, William Alan 41 Cypress Lane Leven Fife FY8 5PS / GB | [2008/44] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Temple Court 13A Cathedral Road Cardiff CF11 9HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Morgan Arcade Chambers 33 St. Mary Street Cardiff CF10 1AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 08007811.6 | 23.04.2008 | [2008/44] | Priority number, date | GB20070008257 | 28.04.2007 Original published format: GB 0708257 | [2008/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1985517 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1985517 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | [2009/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1985517 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B61F5/30, B61F5/34 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
B61F5/34 (EP,US);
B61F5/30 (GB);
B61F5/301 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/44] | Title | German: | Federung für ein Drehgestell eines Schienenfahrzeuges | [2008/44] | English: | Suspension for a bogie of a rail vehicle | [2008/44] | French: | Suspension pour un bogie d'un véhicule ferroviaire | [2008/44] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 23.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.04.2008 | AT | 02.11.2011 | BE | 02.11.2011 | CY | 02.11.2011 | CZ | 02.11.2011 | DK | 02.11.2011 | EE | 02.11.2011 | FI | 02.11.2011 | HR | 02.11.2011 | IT | 02.11.2011 | LT | 02.11.2011 | LV | 02.11.2011 | MT | 02.11.2011 | NL | 02.11.2011 | PL | 02.11.2011 | RO | 02.11.2011 | SI | 02.11.2011 | SK | 02.11.2011 | TR | 02.11.2011 | BG | 02.02.2012 | NO | 02.02.2012 | GR | 03.02.2012 | ES | 13.02.2012 | IS | 02.03.2012 | PT | 02.03.2012 | IE | 23.04.2012 | LU | 23.04.2012 | CH | 30.04.2012 | LI | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
TR | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
IE | 23.04.2012 | ||
LU | 23.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
TR | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
IE | 23.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
IE | 23.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
IE | 23.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
IE | 23.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
IE | 23.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
NO | 02.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4109586 (BRIGGS ALAN H, et al); | [Y]WO2006072800 (SCT TECHNOLOGY LLC [US], et al) | by applicant | US4109586 | WO2006072800 |