EP1985226 - Endoscope system with pivotable arms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karl Storz Endovision, Inc. 91 Carpenter Hill Road Charlton, MA 01507 / US | [2008/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marescaux, Jacques Francois Bernard 50, Rue Principale 67310 Scharrachbergheim / FR | 02 /
Melanson, Jeffrey S. 90 Fiske Hill Rd. Sturbridge 01566 MA / US | 03 /
Dallemagne, Bernard Allée Dubois 20 4052 Beaufays / BE | 04 /
Leroy, Joel Jules Louis 9 rue de Barr 67300 Schiltigheim / FR | 05 /
Mutter, Didier Raoul Daniel 3, Rue de Rempart 67500 Vendenheim / FR | 06 /
Barry, James P. 3 Dennis Wilbur Drive Charlton, MA 01507 / US | 07 /
Storz, Stefan Haydnstrasse 7 78573 Wurmlingen / DE | 08 /
Leonhard, Martin Hohentwielstrasse 7 78576 Emmingen / DE | [2009/08] |
Former [2008/44] | 01 /
Marescaux, Jacques Francois Bernard 50, Rue Principale 67310 Scharrachbergheim / FR | ||
02 /
Melanson, Jeffrey S. 90 Fiske Hill Rd. Sturbridge 01566 MA / US | |||
03 /
Dallemagne, Bernard Allée Dubois 20 4052 Beaufays / BE | Representative(s) | Weller, Wolfgang, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/31] |
Former [2008/44] | Weller, Wolfgang, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 08007936.1 | 24.04.2008 | [2008/44] | Priority number, date | US20070739833 | 25.04.2007 Original published format: US 739833 | [2008/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1985226 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1985226 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | [2009/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1985226 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/018 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
A61B1/018 (EP,US);
A61B1/00087 (EP,US);
A61B1/00098 (EP,US);
A61B17/0218 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2906 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3445 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3447 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/44] | Title | German: | Endoskopsystem mit schwenkbaren Armen | [2008/44] | English: | Endoscope system with pivotable arms | [2008/44] | French: | Système d'endoscope avec bras pivotants | [2008/44] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/21] | 21.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.10.2013 | 10.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 10.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14171731.4 / EP2796083 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 10.06.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 10.06.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.06.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.04.2008 | AT | 30.07.2014 | BE | 30.07.2014 | CY | 30.07.2014 | CZ | 30.07.2014 | DK | 30.07.2014 | EE | 30.07.2014 | ES | 30.07.2014 | FI | 30.07.2014 | HR | 30.07.2014 | LT | 30.07.2014 | LV | 30.07.2014 | MC | 30.07.2014 | MT | 30.07.2014 | NL | 30.07.2014 | PL | 30.07.2014 | RO | 30.07.2014 | SE | 30.07.2014 | SI | 30.07.2014 | SK | 30.07.2014 | TR | 30.07.2014 | BG | 30.10.2014 | NO | 30.10.2014 | GR | 31.10.2014 | IS | 30.11.2014 | PT | 02.12.2014 | IE | 24.04.2015 | LU | 24.04.2015 | CH | 30.04.2015 | LI | 30.04.2015 | [2017/40] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
BE | 30.07.2014 | ||
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
MT | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
IE | 24.04.2015 | ||
LU | 24.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
BE | 30.07.2014 | ||
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
IE | 24.04.2015 | ||
LU | 24.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
IE | 24.04.2015 | ||
LU | 24.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
LU | 24.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
LU | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
LU | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 30.07.2014 | |
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 30.07.2014 | |
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 30.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2006110275 (USGI MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10,12-22 * paragraphs [0090] - [0098] - [0120] - [0122]; figures 6-8,18D,18E * [Y] 4; | [Y]US6059719 (YAMAMOTO TETSUYA [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * column 11, line 44 - column 14, line 3; figures 1,12-15; claim 1 *; | [PX]WO2007104397 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-6,8-23 * the whole document *; | [X]US2005234297 (DEVIERRE JACQUES [BE], et al) [X] 1-4,11,15-17,23 * paragraphs [0050] , [0059] , [0062] - [0069] - [0077] , [0084] , [0085] , [0088]; figures 1,2E,2F,3-6 * | Examination | US6458074 | US2007135686 | by applicant | US6066090 | US6352503 | US7029435 |