EP2111927 - Device for separating paper and cardboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wagensveld BV Postbus 200, Daggeldersweg 6 3440 AE Woerden / NL | [2009/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wagensveld, Albert Daggeldersweg 8 3449 JD Woerden / NL | [2009/44] | Representative(s) | Uittenbogaart, Gustaaf Adolf Indeig B.V. Bloemendaalseweg 277A P.O. Box 3 2050 AA Overveen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | Uittenbogaart, Gustaaf Adolf Indeig B.V. Bloemendaalseweg 277A, P.O. Box 3 2050 AA Overveen / NL | Application number, filing date | 08007997.3 | 25.04.2008 | [2009/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2111927 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B07B13/00, D21B1/02 | [2009/44] | CPC: |
D21B1/023 (EP);
B07B13/003 (EP);
D21B1/028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/27] |
Former [2009/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Trennen von Papier und Karton | [2009/44] | English: | Device for separating paper and cardboard | [2009/44] | French: | Dispositif pour séparer papier et carton | [2009/44] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/44] | 16.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2725641 (LENOIR RAOUL ETS [FR]) [A] 1 * page 8, line 15 - page 11, line 2 ** figures 1,8,9 *; | [A]EP1291092 (GRUMBACH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,4 * paragraphs [0001] , [0013] - [0026] * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP1785200 (WAGENSVELD BV [NL]) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0015] - [0024] * * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | EP1785200 |