EP1987790 - Dismountable medical pincer system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstraße 8 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [2016/28] |
Former [2008/45] | For all designated states Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstraße 8 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stefan, Jochen Bachstraße 5 88639 Wald / DE | 02 /
Bacher, Uwe Unter Hoch 1 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [2016/28] |
Former [2008/45] | 01 /
Stefan, Jochen Bachstrasse 5 88639 Wald / DE | ||
02 /
Bacher, Uwe Unter Hoch 1 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/28] |
Former [2008/45] | Heuckeroth, Volker, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 08008152.4 | 29.04.2008 | [2008/45] | Priority number, date | DE20071021658 | 04.05.2007 Original published format: DE102007021658 | [2008/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1987790 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1987790 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | [2010/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1987790 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/16, A61B17/00, A61B17/29 | [2016/08] | CPC: |
A61B17/1608 (EP,US);
A61B17/1679 (EP,US);
A61B17/1688 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00464 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00482 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2902 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/45] | A61B17/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/28] |
Former [2008/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zerlegbares medizinisches Zangensystem | [2008/45] | English: | Dismountable medical pincer system | [2008/45] | French: | Système de pinces médicales démontables | [2008/45] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 31.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10185212.7 / EP2305145 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.04.2008 | CY | 13.07.2016 | CZ | 13.07.2016 | DK | 13.07.2016 | EE | 13.07.2016 | ES | 13.07.2016 | FI | 13.07.2016 | HR | 13.07.2016 | LT | 13.07.2016 | LV | 13.07.2016 | MC | 13.07.2016 | MT | 13.07.2016 | NL | 13.07.2016 | PL | 13.07.2016 | RO | 13.07.2016 | SE | 13.07.2016 | SI | 13.07.2016 | SK | 13.07.2016 | TR | 13.07.2016 | BG | 13.10.2016 | NO | 13.10.2016 | GR | 14.10.2016 | IS | 13.11.2016 | PT | 14.11.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 29.04.2008 | |
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 29.04.2008 | |
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 13.07.2016 | |
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 13.07.2016 | |
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 13.07.2016 | |
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | CZ | 13.07.2016 | |
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 13.07.2016 | |
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 13.07.2016 | |
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 13.07.2016 | |
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 13.07.2016 | |
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 13.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2005165443 (LIVNEH STEVE [CA]) [X] 1-3,6 * figures 2,3a,3b,3c,3d,4-9 * * paragraphs [0042] - [0058] * [Y] 11-13,15; | [Y]US2004230221 (GADBERRY DONALD L [US], et al) [Y] 11-13,15 * paragraph [0047]; figures 9-11 *; | [A]DE10038085 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9214414 (HEIDMUELLER HARALD [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5282800 (FOSHEE DAVID L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US6099537 (SUGAI TOSHIYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | - VON DER KARL STORZ GMBH & CO., KG vertrieben wird und beispielsweise in dem Firmenkatalog, (2005), page 72 |