EP1990428 - Nucleic acid detection methods using universal priming [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illumina, Inc. 9885 Towne Centre Drive San Diego, California 92121-1975 / US | [2008/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fan, Jian-Bing 5247 Pearlman Way San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 02 /
Chee, Mark S. 325 Arroyo Drive Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | [2008/46] | Representative(s) | Tollervey, Rebecca Marie, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Tollervey, Rebecca Marie, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 08008155.7 | 07.02.2001 | [2008/46] | Priority number, date | US20000180810P | 07.02.2000 Original published format: US 180810 P | US20000234732P | 22.09.2000 Original published format: US 234732 P | [2010/51] |
Former [2008/46] | US20000180810 | 07.02.2000 | |
US20000234732 | 22.09.2000 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1990428 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1990428 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2008/46] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6816 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6809 (EP,US);
C12Q1/682 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6834 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6837 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6853 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6809, C12Q2563/179, C12Q2525/161, C12Q2525/155 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6809, C12Q2565/501, C12Q2563/131, C12Q2525/155 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6816, C12Q2563/179, C12Q2533/107, C12Q2525/173 (US,EP);
C12Q1/682, C12Q2565/501, C12Q2563/179, C12Q2531/125 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6834, C12Q2565/519, C12Q2533/107, C12Q2525/161 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6837, C12Q2563/179, C12Q2525/161, C12Q2525/155 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6853, C12Q2565/501, C12Q2563/179, C12Q2533/107 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6858, C12Q2565/501, C12Q2563/179, C12Q2533/107 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2008/46] | Title | German: | Nukleinsäuredetektionsverfahren mit universellem Priming | [2008/46] | English: | Nucleic acid detection methods using universal priming | [2008/46] | French: | Procédés de détection d'acide nucléique utilisant un amorçage universel | [2008/46] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/46] | 01.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01910466.0 / EP1259643 | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.12.2010 | BE | 22.12.2010 | CY | 22.12.2010 | DK | 22.12.2010 | FI | 22.12.2010 | TR | 22.12.2010 | LU | 07.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | GR | 23.03.2011 | ES | 02.04.2011 | PT | 22.04.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LU | 07.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/43] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9615271 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [A] * claims 1-6 * * pages 4,5,11, * * page 15 * * figures 1,2 * * page 13, paragraph 4 *; | [A]WO9745559 (CORNELL RES FOUNDATION INC [US], et al) [A] * page 15 - page 17 * * page 19, lines 4-9 * * page 23, lines 9-12 * * page 33, lines 4-26 * * page 43, lines 22-26 * * page 45, lines 25-29 * * claims 1,5 * * figures 1,9 * * page 34, line 26 - line 29 *; | [A]WO9804746 (SINAI SCHOOL MEDICINE [US]) [A] * page 10, paragraph 2 - page 12, paragraph 2 * * claims 1,2 *; | [A]WO9922030 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO0004193 (UNIV YALE [US]) [A] * pages 11-13 * | by applicant | US5681702 | US5681697 | WO0063437 | - NICKERSON, CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 4, pages 48 - 51 | - ABRAMSON ET AL., CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 4, pages 41 - 47 | - HERMANSON, Bioconjugate Techniques, ACADEMIC PRESS, pages 640 - 643 | US19970818199 | US19980151877 |