EP1989975 - Sales display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wanzl Metallwarenfabrik GmbH Postfach 11 29 89336 Leipheim / DE | [2008/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Handerer, Manfred Weilerstrasse 6a 89368 Winterbach / DE | [2008/46] | Application number, filing date | 08008228.2 | 30.04.2008 | [2008/46] | Priority number, date | DE20071022679 | 11.05.2007 Original published format: DE102007022679 | [2008/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1989975 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A47F5/00, A47F5/10, A47F5/14, F16B7/04 | [2008/46] | CPC: |
A47F5/0031 (EP);
A47F5/137 (EP);
F16B7/0413 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/46] | Title | German: | Verkaufsständer | [2008/46] | English: | Sales display | [2008/46] | French: | Présentoir de vente | [2008/46] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/26] | 09.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/16] | 03.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE20217715U (VISPLAY INTERNAT AG MUTTENZ [CH]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]US6371313 (WALTER HERBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]US4453640 (CILLARIO LORENZO [IT]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]GB1446865 (MARLER HALEY EXPOSYSTEMS LTD) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]US4775259 (SHELL IRVING [US]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]US4693383 (FENWICK JAY G [US]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0078467 (FEHLBAUM & CO [CH]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]US4191438 (DAY ROBERT H [US]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]US5505318 (GOFF GERALD L [US]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]DE102005020253 (WANZL METALLWARENFABRIK KG [DE]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]DE539143 (ALBIN LASCH & CO G M B H) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]DE817396 (KREBS KURT ERICH) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]US4285610 (RUSCH RICHARD B) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2247116 (MEUSIENNE CONST MEC [FR]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]GB396867 (HANS HOFFMANN, et al) [X] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE8415230U | DE7514362U |