EP1992825 - Master cylinder with a dirt cover [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2012/11] |
Former [2011/17] | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states LuK Lamellen und Kupplungsbau Beteiligungs KG Industriestrasse 3 77815 Bühl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sester, Christof Engelgasse 11 77723 Gegenbach / DE | 02 /
Wagner, Vadim Am Rain 15 77652 Offenburg / DE | [2008/47] | Application number, filing date | 08008325.6 | 02.05.2008 | [2008/47] | Priority number, date | DE20071023278 | 18.05.2007 Original published format: DE102007023278 | [2008/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1992825 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1992825 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F15B7/08, F16D25/08 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
F15B7/08 (EP);
F16D25/08 (EP);
F16D2025/081 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/47] | Title | German: | Geberzylinder mit einer Schmutzabdeckung | [2008/47] | English: | Master cylinder with a dirt cover | [2008/47] | French: | Maître cylindre avec protection anti-contamination | [2010/12] |
Former [2008/47] | Cylindre capteur doté d'une protection contre la poussière | Examination procedure | 24.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 19.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/49] | 01.08.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE19516391 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-9 * column 2, lines 40-52; figure 1 * [I] 5,10; | [X]DE9010939U (FAG KUGELFISCHER GEORG SCHÄFER KG&A) [X] 1,8 * page 2, lines 22-30 *; | [X]FR2779499 (VALEO [FR]) [X] 1 * page 19, lines 14-24; figure 10 *; | [A] - "RUBBER-ON-PLASTIC INJECTION MOULDING", DESIGN ENGINEERING, MORGAN-GRAMPIAN LTD. LONDON, GB, (19830101), ISSN 0308-8448, page 21, XP001173689 [A] 2 |