EP2000046 - Toothbrush [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GILLETTE CANADA COMPANY 4 Robert Speck Parkway Mississauga Ontario L4Z 4C5 / CA | [2008/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Claire-Zimmet, Karen 41 Shirley Road Waltham, MA 02452 / US | 02 /
Masterman, Thomas Craig 26 Linden Street No.2 Brookline, MA 02446 / US | 03 /
Bredall, William A. 257 Marvilla Circle Pacifica, CA 94004 / US | 04 /
Schreck, James 1318 Santa Fe Drive Iowa City, IA 52246 / US | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/50] | 01 /
Claire-Zimmet, Karen 41 Shirley Road Waltham, MA 02452 / US | ||
02 /
Masterman, Thomas Craig 264 Henry Street San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | |||
03 /
Bredall, William A. 257 Marvilla Circle Pacifica, CA 94004 / US | |||
04 /
Schreck, James 1318 Santa Fe Drive Iowa City, IA 52246 / US | Representative(s) | Töpert, Verena Clarita Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/38] | Töpert, Verena Clarita Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Patent Department Frankfurter Str. 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2008/50] | Zetterer, Gerd Braun GmbH Patentabteilung Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08008414.8 | 10.05.2001 | [2008/50] | Priority number, date | US20000576590 | 22.05.2000 Original published format: US 576590 | [2008/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2000046 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2000046 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | [2009/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2000046 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A46B9/04, A46B7/06, A46B5/00 | [2008/50] | CPC: |
A46B9/045 (EP,US);
A46B9/04 (KR);
A46B5/0025 (EP,US);
A46B9/025 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2016/38] |
Former [2008/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Zahnbürste | [2008/50] | English: | Toothbrush | [2008/50] | French: | Brosse à dents | [2008/50] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 08.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 20.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01933254.3 / EP1284621 | Divisional application(s) | EP10012738.0 / EP2319359 | EP10012739.8 / EP2319360 | EP10012740.6 / EP2319361 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010933254) is 01.04.2005 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/35] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 18.03.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 18.03.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.04.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 06.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.09.2016 | BE | 21.09.2016 | CY | 21.09.2016 | DK | 21.09.2016 | FI | 21.09.2016 | IT | 21.09.2016 | MC | 21.09.2016 | TR | 21.09.2016 | GR | 22.12.2016 | PT | 23.01.2017 | IE | 10.05.2017 | LU | 10.05.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 10.05.2017 | ||
LU | 10.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 10.05.2017 | ||
LU | 10.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 10.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 21.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB247005 (LOUIS HORWITZ) [X] 1-8,26 * the whole document *; | [A]FR683311 (KOSTRITSKY SERGE) [A] 1-8,26,29,31,32 * the whole document *; | [X]DE592757 (OTTO NEUBAUER) [X] 19-25 * the whole document *; | [AX]FR792476 (THIBAUD) [A] 1-8,26 * the whole document * [X] 29,31,32; | [XA]US2064860 (IOJI SEKINE) [X] 19,21,22 * the whole document * [A] 20,23-25; | [X]FR855253 (O. JOSEPHSON) [X] 19-25 * the whole document *; | [X]US2273278 (BETTY MACKENZIE-KENNEDY) [X] 1-8,26 * the whole document *; | [A]CH324623 (FEHR V FALKE MARGARETHE [DE], et al) [A] 1-8,26 * page 2, column 1, line 12 - line 22 * * figures 1,2 *; | [XA]US4051571 (AYERS HERBERT D) [X] 19,21,22 * the whole document * [A] 20,23-25; | [X]US4131967 (NORTHEMANN KARL-HEINZ, et al) [X] 1-8,26 * the whole document *; | [X]US4268933 (PAPAS SOPHIA) [X] 29* the whole document *; | [X]FR2548528 (JOUVIN JEAN LUC [FR]) [X] 1-8,19-26 * the whole document *; | [AX]US4570282 (KAUFMAN MARTIN H [US], et al) [A] 1-8,26 * the whole document * [X] 29,31,32; | [X]WO9506420 (LINGNER & FISCHER GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 29 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9836661 (STERN MIRI MINA [IL]) [X] 1-8,26 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0894454 (STAFFORD MILLER LTD [GB]) [A] 1-8,26 * abstract * * column 3, line 30 - line 50 * * figure 1 * | by applicant | US3085273 | US4570282 | US4706322 |