EP2128465 - Roller bearing, roller body for roller bearing and device with roller body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gebert, Karl, Dr. Benno-Merkle-Strasse 4 97424 Schweinfurt / DE | [2009/49] | Application number, filing date | 08008926.1 | 14.05.2008 | [2009/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2128465 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2128465 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/32, F16C33/34, F16C33/36, F16C33/66 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
F16C33/32 (EP,US);
F16C25/083 (EP,US);
F16C33/303 (EP,US);
F16C33/667 (EP,US);
F16C33/6674 (EP,US);
F16C19/54 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE [2010/32] |
Former [2009/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wälzlager, Wälzkörper für Wälzlager und Gerät mit Wälzlager | [2009/49] | English: | Roller bearing, roller body for roller bearing and device with roller body | [2009/49] | French: | Palier à roulement, élément roulant pour palier à roulement et appareil doté d'un palier à roulement | [2009/49] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/22] | 03.06.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.07.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004240763 (R JAYAPRAKASH [IN], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] *; | [A]DE102006050122 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0006] *; | [A]US2003158047 (DENPO KATSUAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * |