EP2076104 - Flexible film and display device comprising the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2009/27] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yoido-Dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Sang Gon RMC division No.50 Hyangjung-dong Heungduk-gu Chungju-si Choongchungbuk-do 361-480 / KR | 02 /
Kim, Dae Sung RMC division No.50 Hyangjung-dong Heungduk-gu Chungju-si Choongchungbuk-do 361-480 / KR | 03 /
Chang, Woo Hyuck RMC division No.50 Hyangjung-dong Heungduk-gu Chungju-si Choongchungbuk-do 361-480 / KR | [2009/27] | Representative(s) | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08009009.5 | 15.05.2008 | [2009/27] | Priority number, date | KR20070138829 | 27.12.2007 Original published format: KR 20070138829 | [2009/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2076104 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2076104 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/24 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
H05K3/244 (EP,US);
H05K3/46 (KR);
H01L23/4985 (EP,US);
G02F1/13452 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12044 (EP,US);
H05K1/0393 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10128 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10681 (EP,US);
H05K2203/072 (EP,US);
H05K3/323 (EP,US);
H05K3/361 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12528 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/27] | Title | German: | Flexible Folie und Anzeigevorrichtung damit | [2009/27] | English: | Flexible film and display device comprising the same | [2009/27] | French: | Film flexible et dispositif d'affichage comportant ce film | [2009/27] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2008 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 20.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.10.2014 | 14.10.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/11] | 31.10.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5603158 (MURATA KATSUHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 11,15,16 * column 3, line 18 - column 6, line 7; figure - *; | [X]US6426548 (MITA MAMORU [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,10,11,13,17 * column 1, line 7 - column 2, line 16 * * column 10, line 43 - column 14, line 14; figures 1-6 *; | [X]US2003098513 (HUANG YUAN-CHANG [TW]) [X] 1-3,6-8,11,13* page 3, paragraph 37 - page 4, paragraph 53; figure - *; | [X]US2005183884 (SU PI-CHUAN [TW]) [X] 1-3,6-8,11,13,15,16 * page 2, paragraph 44 - page 3, paragraph 51 *; | [XY]JP2005286275 (YAMATO ELECTRIC IND) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * figure - * [Y] 11,15,16 | Examination | EP0773710 | EP0493870 | JPH04342148 | JPH0878599 | EP0773710 | JPH1116954 | EP1008896 | JP2002290028 | JP2003045917 | JP2005064265 | DE202005010364U | EP1617655 | US2006055023 | US2006060961 | US2006115670 | US2007013856 | WO2007102691 | WO2007139479 | by applicant | US5603158 | US6426548 | US2003098513 | US2005183884 | JP2005286275 |