EP1998049 - Flow processing machine blade with multi-profile configuration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce Deutschland Ltd & Co KG Eschenweg 11 15827 Blankenfelde-Mahlow / DE | [2008/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gümmer, Volker Max-Planck-Strasse 12B 15831 Malow / DE | [2008/49] | Representative(s) | Weber, Joachim Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/49] | Weber, Joachim Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08009031.9 | 15.05.2008 | [2008/49] | Priority number, date | DE20071024840 | 29.05.2007 Original published format: DE102007024840 | [2008/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1998049 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1998049 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | [2010/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/24, F04D29/38 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
F04D29/324 (EP,US);
F01D5/145 (EP);
F01D5/146 (EP);
F01D5/20 (EP);
F04D29/682 (EP);
F04D29/684 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Strömungsarbeitsmaschinenschaufel mit Multi-Profil-Gestaltung | [2008/49] | English: | Flow processing machine blade with multi-profile configuration | [2008/49] | French: | Aube de machine de travail d'écoulement doté d'une conception à plusieurs profiles | [2008/49] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US285212 ; | [XI]US680671 (BREWSTER FRANCIS WENTWORTH [GB]); | [XI]US1344496 (FLATTUM ALBERT L); | [XI]US3044559 (JOSEPH CHAJMIK); | [XI]WO8203430 (FOEHN OY [FI], et al); | [X]EP0295353 (KHAMMAS AHMAD [DE]); | [XI]JP2000009097 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [XI]US2005129518 (HAVEL BRIAN [CA], et al) |