EP2000337 - Fan assembly for ventilating a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schuch, Andreas Robert-Mayer-Strasse 3 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE | 02 /
Augull, Michael Kernerstrasse 2 71088 Holzgerlingen / DE | 03 /
Pfander, Andreas Schönfelder Strasse 14 71384 Weinstadt / DE | 04 /
Burkhardt, Carsten Nelkenstrasse 26 74653 Künzelsau / DE | [2008/50] | Representative(s) | Grauel, Andreas, et al Grauel IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Wartbergstrasse 14 70191 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | Grauel, Andreas, et al Grauel IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Presselstrasse 10 70191 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 08009045.9 | 16.05.2008 | [2008/50] | Priority number, date | DE20071026808 | 06.06.2007 Original published format: DE102007026808 | [2008/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2000337 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2000337 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | [2009/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2000337 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [2008/50] | CPC: |
B60H1/00028 (EP);
B60H1/00457 (EP);
B60H2001/00085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/50] | Title | German: | Gebläseanordnung zur Belüftung eines Fahrzeugs | [2008/50] | English: | Fan assembly for ventilating a vehicle | [2008/50] | French: | Agencement de ventilateur destiné à l'aération d'un véhicule | [2008/50] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 09.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.05.2008 | CY | 21.03.2012 | CZ | 21.03.2012 | DK | 21.03.2012 | EE | 21.03.2012 | FI | 21.03.2012 | HR | 21.03.2012 | IT | 21.03.2012 | LT | 21.03.2012 | LV | 21.03.2012 | MT | 21.03.2012 | NL | 21.03.2012 | PL | 21.03.2012 | RO | 21.03.2012 | SE | 21.03.2012 | SI | 21.03.2012 | SK | 21.03.2012 | TR | 21.03.2012 | IE | 16.05.2012 | LU | 16.05.2012 | BE | 31.05.2012 | CH | 31.05.2012 | LI | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | BG | 21.06.2012 | NO | 21.06.2012 | GR | 22.06.2012 | ES | 02.07.2012 | IS | 21.07.2012 | PT | 23.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
IT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
TR | 21.03.2012 | ||
IE | 16.05.2012 | ||
LU | 16.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
IT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
TR | 21.03.2012 | ||
IE | 16.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
IT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
IE | 16.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
IT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
IE | 16.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
IT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
IE | 16.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
IT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
IE | 16.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
IT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
IT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 21.03.2012 | |
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 21.03.2012 | |
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 21.03.2012 | |
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 21.03.2012 | |
NO | 21.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19838174 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-9,15 * column 4, lines 37-58; figure 1 *; | [X]US6138749 (KAWAI TAKAYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-9,15 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 8; figure 1 *; | [X]DE19954308 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-9,15 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 65; figure 1 *; | [X]DE102005001970 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,5,15* paragraph [0019]; figures 5,6 * | by applicant | DE10234345 |