EP2128204 - Metal effect pigment with additive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eckart GmbH Güntersthal 4 91235 Hartenstein / DE | For all designated states BYK-Chemie GmbH Abelstrasse 45 46483 Wesel / DE | [2011/08] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Eckart GmbH Güntersthal 4 91235 Hartenstein / DE | ||
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states Eckart GmbH Kaiserstrasse 30 90763 Fürth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prölss, Dieter Stromerstrasse 1b 91126 Schwabach / DE | 02 /
Trummer, Stefan, Dr. Valznerweiherstrasse 79 90480 Nürnberg / DE | 03 /
Roth, Stephan, Dr. Schleglstrasse 10 95447 Bayreuth / DE | 04 /
Gertzen Bärbel, Dr. Elsepassweg 150 46446 Emmerich / DE | 05 /
Pritschins, Wolfgang, Dr. Kleiststrasse 4 46487 Wesel / DE | 06 /
Omeis, Jürgen, Dr. Wiesental 35 46286 Dorsten-Lembeck / DE | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08009700.9 | 28.05.2008 | [2009/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2128204 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/62, C09C1/64, C09C1/66, C09D5/36, C09D7/12, A61K8/11, A61Q1/02 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/11 (EP,US);
A61K8/39 (EP,US);
A61K8/86 (EP,US);
C09C1/62 (EP,US);
C09C1/622 (EP,US);
C09C1/625 (EP,US);
C09C1/646 (EP,US);
C09C1/66 (EP,US);
C09D5/36 (EP,US);
C09D7/62 (EP,US);
A61K2800/412 (EP,US);
A61K2800/413 (EP,US);
A61K2800/43 (EP,US);
C01P2004/54 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2004/86 (EP,US);
C01P2006/60 (EP,US);
C01P2006/62 (EP,US);
C01P2006/63 (EP,US);
C01P2006/64 (EP,US);
C01P2006/65 (EP,US);
C01P2006/66 (EP,US);
C08K3/08 (EP,US);
C08K9/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | Metalleffektpigment mit Additiv | [2009/49] | English: | Metal effect pigment with additive | [2009/49] | French: | Pigment à effet métallique comprenant un additif | [2009/49] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 27.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/40] | 23.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1538456 (CHEMOLIMPEX); | [X]US3551174 (HAUSKA MIKLOS, et al); | [X]FR2064024 (PECHINEY); | [AD]US3857865 (STURWOLD R, et al); | [X]US4629512 (KONDIS TOM [US]); | [X]EP0240367 (TOYO ALUMINIUM KK [JP]); | [X]EP0569907 (BASF CORP [US]); | [A]DE10361437 (ECKART GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [X]US2007051272 (WHEELER IAN R [GB]); | [A]US2008087187 (MAUL ROBERT [DE], et al) | by applicant | DE2436902 | DE3002175 | WO9817731 | WO9957204 | WO0236695 | WO0236697 | EP1304210 | DE202004005921U | WO2004087816 | EP1621586 | WO2006070108 |