EP2003338 - Device and method for generating electrical energy in small power plants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conpower Energieanlagen GmbH & Co KG Brunhamstrasse 21 81249 München / DE | [2008/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Helmbold, Hermann Vor der Hurth 31 57250 Netphen / DE | 02 /
Wimmer, Franz Eschenstrasse 5 82110 Germering / DE | [2012/01] |
Former [2008/51] | 01 /
Helmbold, Hermann Schulweg 2 57392 Schmallenberg / DE | ||
02 /
Wimmer, Franz Eschenstrasse 5 82110 Germering / DE | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Karl Michael Buchenweg 65 47447 Moers / DE | [2008/51] | Application number, filing date | 08010045.6 | 02.06.2008 | [2008/51] | Priority number, date | DE20071027347 | 14.06.2007 Original published format: DE102007027347 | [2008/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2003338 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/51] | Classification | IPC: | F03G7/00 | [2008/51] | CPC: |
F03G7/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Einrichtung und Verfahren zur Erzeugung elektrischer Energie in Kleinkraftwerksanlagen | [2008/51] | English: | Device and method for generating electrical energy in small power plants | [2008/51] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de production d'énergie électrique dans des petites centrales électriques | [2008/51] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/31] | 27.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US2007101735 |