EP2020463 - Coffer dam and method for shielding an offshore structure from surrounding water by using same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WeserWind GmbH Offshore Construction Georgsmarienhütte Riedemannstrasse 1 27572 Bremerhaven / DE | [2021/20] |
Former [2009/06] | For all designated states WeserWind GmbH Offshore Construction Georgsmarienhütte Am Lunedeich 158 27572 Bremerhaven / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kassen, Carsten Osterdeich 146 28205 Bremen / DE | 02 /
Krallmann, Peter Reinhold-Schneider-Strasse 63 49088 Osnabrück / DE | 03 /
Dörfeldt, Stefan Bussstrasse 5 26789 Leer / DE | 04 /
Bicker, Sven Ritterstasse 16 26789 Leer / DE | [2009/06] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2009/06] | Scholz, Volker Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08010102.5 | 03.06.2008 | [2009/06] | Priority number, date | DE20071036541 | 02.08.2007 Original published format: DE102007036541 | [2009/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2020463 | Date: | 04.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E02D19/04, E02B17/00 | [2009/06] | CPC: |
E02D19/04 (EP);
E02B17/0034 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/06] | Title | German: | Kofferdamm und Verfahren zur Abstimmung eines Offshore-Aufbaus gegen umgebendes Wasser unter Verwendung desselben | [2009/06] | English: | Coffer dam and method for shielding an offshore structure from surrounding water by using same | [2009/06] | French: | Batardeau-caisson et procédé de protection d'une construction offshore contre l'eau environnante en utilisant celui-ci | [2009/06] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2008 | Examination requested [2009/06] | 03.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/09] | 28.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/09] | Public notification(s) | Mitteilung gemäß Regel 142 EPÜ (Wiederaufnahme des Verfahrens nach Regel 142 (2) EPÜ vom 10.05.2021) | WeserWind GmbH Offshore Construction Georgsmarienhütte Riedemannstrasse 1 27572 Bremerhaven / DE | [2021/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.11.2021 | 08   M06   Not yet paid | 02.11.2021 | 09   M06   Not yet paid | 02.11.2021 | 10   M06   Not yet paid | 02.11.2021 | 11   M06   Not yet paid | 02.11.2021 | 12   M06   Not yet paid | 02.11.2021 | 13   M06   Not yet paid | 02.11.2021 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 01.04.2015 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2015/21] | 02.11.2021 | Resumption of proceedings | [2021/20] | 01.04.2015 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2021/20] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09189043 (PACIFIC CONSULTANTS KK, et al) [X] 1,4-8,10,11 * figures 1-4 *; | [X]JPH09268562 (PENTA OCEAN CONSTRUCTION) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0010]; figures 1,2,8,9 *; | [A]JPH09242081 (PENTA OCEAN CONSTRUCTION) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-4,10-12 *; | [A]JP2006249685 (JFE ENG KK, et al) [A] 13 * figures 3,4,7 * | by applicant | BE902531 | GB208620 | US3710579 | GB1375970 |