EP2009583 - Card data carrier with detection pad [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASTRA Gesellschaft für Asset Management mbH & Co. KG Steinradweg 3 30890 Barsinghausen / DE | [2009/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stobbe, Anatoli Steinradweg 3 30890 Barsinghausen / DE | 02 /
Knop, Werner Dr. Lise-Meitner-Strasse 7 30974 Wennigsen / DE | [2009/01] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Thömen & Körner Zeppelinstraße 5 30175 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Patentanwälte Thömen & Körner Zeppelinstrasse 5 30175 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2009/01] | Patentanwälte Thömen & Körner Zeppelinstrasse 5 30175 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 08010245.2 | 05.06.2008 | [2009/01] | Priority number, date | DE20071029083 | 21.06.2007 Original published format: DE102007029083 | [2009/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2009583 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2009/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2009583 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | [2009/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2009583 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077, H01Q1/38, H01Q9/04, H01Q1/22 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
G06K19/07756 (EP,US);
H01Q1/2208 (EP,US);
H01Q1/38 (EP,US);
H01Q7/00 (EP,US);
H01Q9/0407 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/18] |
Former [2009/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kartendatenträger mit Detektierplättchen | [2009/01] | English: | Card data carrier with detection pad | [2009/01] | French: | Support de données sur carte doté de petites plaques de détection | [2009/01] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 27.02.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.04.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 07.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2013 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 03.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2013 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.05.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 02.05.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.06.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19916180 (CUBIT ELECTRONICS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-11 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 6 - line 29 *; | [X]DE10112899 (DCS DIREKTMARKETING & CARD SER [DE]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0015]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2005025553 (HOHBERGER CLIVE P [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0009] *; | [X]US2007095926 (ZHU SHENGBO [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract *; | [X]US6975834 (FORSTER IAN J [GB]) [X] 1-11 * figure 6 *; | [X]JP2005190043 (SAGAWA INSATSU KK, et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract *; | [X]DE20110585U (CUBIT ELECTRONICS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-11 * page 4; figure - *; | [X]US2003141590 (KAMIYA MASASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0007] , [0012] , [0026] , [0028]; figure - * | by applicant | DE19916180 | DE10112899 | DE20110585U |