EP2133764 - Error-proof automation system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mattes, Rainer Olkstrasse 10 54349 Trittenheim / DE | 02 /
Weber, Uwe Eisenstrasse 22 90542 Eckental / DE | [2009/51] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/42] | Application number, filing date | 08010462.3 | 09.06.2008 | [2009/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2133764 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2133764 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/05, G05B19/042 | [2009/51] | CPC: |
G05B19/058 (EP);
G05B19/0428 (EP);
G05B2219/14028 (EP);
G05B2219/14133 (EP);
G05B2219/24187 (EP);
G05B2219/24191 (EP);
G05B2219/24195 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2010/34] |
Former [2009/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fehlersicheres Automatisierungssystem und Verfahren | [2009/51] | English: | Error-proof automation system and method | [2009/51] | French: | Système d'automatisation à sécurité intrinsèque et procédé | [2009/51] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 17.06.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 09.06.2013 | [2014/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1857936 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,6,8,9 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0076]; figures 1-5 * [Y] 3-5; | [Y]DE3740290 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3,4 * column 5, line 28 - column 7, line 9; figure 5 *; | [Y]WO2005052703 (SIEMENS AG [DE]; KLEYER DIETER [DE]; OTT WOLFGANG [DE]) [Y] 5 * page 7, line 6 - line 14; figure 1 *; | [A] - SYKORA M R, "THE DESIGN AND APPLICATION OF REDUNDANT PROGRAMMABLE CONTROLLERS", CONTROL ENGINEERING, REED BUSINESS INFORMATION, HIGHLANDS RANCH, CO, US, (19820701), vol. 29, no. 8, ISSN 0010-8049, pages 77 - 79, XP002057993 [A] 1-9 * page 79, column R, line 1, paragraph L * |