EP2003040 - Control apparatus for electric power steering system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University Corporation Nagoya Institute of Technology 29, Aza Kiichi Gokiso-cho, Showa-ku Nagoya-city Aichi 466-0061 / JP | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [2013/30] |
Former [2008/51] | For all designated states National University Corporation Nagoya Institute of Technology 29, Aza Kiichi Gokiso-cho, Showa-ku Nagoya-city Aichi 466-0061 / JP | ||
For all designated states Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ukai, Hiroyuki@c/o Nat. Uni. Corp. Nagoya Inst. of Tech. 29, Aza Kiichi, Gokiso-cho Showa-ku Nagoya-city Aichi-pref., 466-0061 / JP | 02 /
Morita, Yoshifumi@c/o Nat. Uni. Corp. Nagoya Inst. of Tech. 29, Aza Kiichi, Gokiso-cho Showa-ku Nagoya-city Aichi-pref., 466-0061 / JP | 03 /
Iwasaki, Makoto@c/o Nat. Uni. Corp. Nagoya Inst. of Tech. 29, Aza Kiichi, Gokiso-cho Showa-ku Nagoya-city Aichi-pref., 466-0061 / JP | 04 /
Matsui, Nobuyuki@c/o Nat. Uni. Corp. Nagoya Inst. of Tech. 29, Aza Kiichi, Gokiso-cho Showa-ku Nagoya-city Aichi-pref., 466-0061 / JP | 05 /
Tsuchida, Norio@c/o Nat. Uni. Corp. Nagoya Inst. of Tech. 29, Aza Kiichi, Gokiso-cho Showa-ku Nagoya-city Aichi-pref., 466-0061 / JP | 06 /
Yamamoto, Yuya@c/o Nat. Uni. Corp. Nagoya Inst. of Tech. 29, Aza Kiichi, Gokiso-cho Showa-ku Nagoya-city Aichi-pref., 466-0061 / JP | 07 /
Hayashi, Jiro@c/o Denso Corporation Intellectual Property Dept. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | 08 /
Sawada, Akihiko@c/o Denso Corporation Intellectual Property Dept. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | 09 /
Makino, Nobuhiko@c/o Denso Corporation Intellectual Property Dept. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | [2013/22] |
Former [2008/52] | 01 /
Ukai, Hiroyuki c/o Nat. Uni. Corp. Nagoya Inst. of Tech. 29, Aza Kiichi Gokiso-cho Showa-ku Nagoya-city Aichi-pref., 466-0061 / JP | ||
02 /
Morita, Yoshifumi c/o Nat. Uni. Corp. Nagoya Inst. of Tech. 29, Aza Kiichi Gokiso-cho Showa-ku Nagoya-city Aichi-pref., 466-0061 / JP | |||
03 /
Iwasaki, Makoto c/o Nat. Uni. Corp. Nagoya Inst. of Tech. 29, Aza Kiichi Gokiso-cho Showa-ku Nagoya-city Aichi-pref., 466-0061 / JP | |||
04 /
Matsui, Nobuyuki c/o Nat. Uni. Corp. Nagoya Inst. of Tech. 29, Aza Kiichi Gokiso-cho Showa-ku Nagoya-city Aichi-pref., 466-0061 / JP | |||
05 /
Tsuchida, Norio c/o Denso Corporation IPD 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | |||
06 /
Yamamoto, Yuya c/o Nat. Uni. Corp. Nagoya Inst. of Tech. 29, Aza Kiichi Gokiso-cho Showa-ku Nagoya-city Aichi-pref., 466-0061 / JP | |||
07 /
Hayashi, Jiro c/o Denso Corporation Int. Prop. Dept. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | |||
08 /
Sawada, Akihiko c/o Denso Corporation Int. Prop. Dept. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | |||
09 /
Makino, Nobuhiko c/o Denso Corporation Int. Prop. Dept. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | |||
Former [2008/51] | 01 /
Ukai, Hiroyuki c/o Nat. Uni. Corp. Nagoya Inst. of Tech. 29, Aza Kiichi Gokiso-cho Showa-ku Nagoya-city Aichi-pref., 466-0061 / JP | ||
02 /
Morita, Yoshifumi c/o Nat. Uni. Corp. Nagoya Inst. of Tech. 29, Aza Kiichi Gokiso-cho Showa-ku Nagoya-city Aichi-pref., 466-0061 / JP | |||
03 /
Iwasaki, Makoto c/o Nat. Uni. Corp. Nagoya Inst. of Tech. 29, Aza Kiichi Gokiso-cho Showa-ku Nagoya-city Aichi-pref., 466-0061 / JP | |||
04 /
Matsui, Nobuyuki c/o Nat. Uni. Corp. Nagoya Inst. of Tech. 29, Aza Kiichi Gokiso-cho Showa-ku Nagoya-city Aichi-pref., 466-0061 / JP | |||
05 /
Tsuchida, Norio c/o Nat. Uni. Corp. Nagoya Inst. of Tech. 29, Aza Kiichi Gokiso-cho Showa-ku Nagoya-city Aichi-pref., 466-0061 / JP | |||
06 /
Yamamoto, Yuya c/o Nat. Uni. Corp. Nagoya Inst. of Tech. 29, Aza Kiichi Gokiso-cho Showa-ku Nagoya-city Aichi-pref., 466-0061 / JP | |||
07 /
Hayashi, Jiro c/o Denso Corporation Int. Prop. Dept. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | |||
08 /
Sawada, Akihiko c/o Denso Corporation Int. Prop. Dept. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | |||
09 /
Makino, Nobuhiko c/o Denso Corporation Int. Prop. Dept. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2008/51] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 08010646.1 | 11.06.2008 | [2008/51] | Priority number, date | JP20070154332 | 11.06.2007 Original published format: JP 2007154332 | [2008/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2003040 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2003040 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2003040 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/04, B62D6/00 | [2008/51] | CPC: |
B62D6/008 (EP,US);
B62D5/046 (EP,US);
B62D5/0463 (EP,US);
B62D5/0481 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2012/39] |
Former [2008/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Steuervorrichtung für ein elektrisches Servolenkungssystem | [2008/51] | English: | Control apparatus for electric power steering system | [2008/51] | French: | Appareil de commande pour système de direction assistée électrique | [2008/51] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/35] | 18.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4300366 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [X]US2004189239 (ISLAM MOHAMMAD S [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * * claims 9,10 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP1508500 (TOYODA MACHINE WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 4,7,8 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026] * | by applicant | JP2000103349 | JP2002293257 | US6594569 | US6876910 |