EP1962132 - Liquid crystal display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2010 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aminaka, Eiichiro Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Nishiura, Yosuke Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Amimori, Ichiro Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08010954.9 | 10.03.1998 | [2008/35] | Priority number, date | JP19970055316 | 10.03.1997 Original published format: JP 5531697 | [2008/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1962132 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1962132 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13363, G02F1/139, G02B5/30 | [2008/42] | CPC: |
G02F1/133632 (EP,KR,US);
G02B5/3016 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/133634 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/1393 (EP,KR,US);
G02F2413/105 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/35] | G02F1/139, G02F1/13363 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2009/31] |
Former [2008/35] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallanzeige | [2008/35] | English: | Liquid crystal display | [2008/35] | French: | Affichage à cristaux liquides | [2008/35] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/28] | 27.05.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, ES, IT, SE | 15.07.2009 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 26.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/20] | 04.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: information on prior art not received in time [2010/20] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98104264.1 / EP0864906 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0350382 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,6,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5528400 (ARAKAWA KOHEI [JP]) [A] 1,2,5-8,10-16* examples 1,2; tables 1,3 *; | [A] - SHIN-TSON WU, "FILM-COMPENSATED HOMEOTROPIC LIQUID-CRYSTAL CELL FOR DIRECT VIEW DISPLAY", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (19941115), vol. 76, no. 10, PART 01, pages 5975 - 5980, XP000491748 [A] 1,3,4,6,8,9 *sections IIA, IIIA, IIIB, IIIC*;; figures 1,4-8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.358377 | by applicant | US2367661 | US2367670 | US2448828 | US2722512 | US2951758 | US3046127 | US3549367 | US4212970 | US4239850 | EP0576304 | US5583679 | US5646703 | - NIKKEI MICRODEVICE, (1996), no. 136, page 147 | - C. DESTRADE ET AL., MOL. CRYSR. LIQ. CRYST., (1981), vol. 71, page 111 | - Japan Chemical Society, Quarterly Chemical Review, (1994), vol. 2 | - B. KOHNE ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. SOC. CHEM. COMM., (1985), page 1794 | - J. ZHANG ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1994), vol. 116, page 2655 |