EP2007004 - Induction motor drive unit, motor drive system, and elevating system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.05.2011 [2011/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Industrial Equipment Systems Co., Ltd. 3, Kanda Neribei-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0022 / JP | [2010/23] |
Former [2008/52] | For all designated states Hitachi Industrial Equipment Systems Co. Ltd. 3, Kanda Neribei-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0022 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arakawa, Yoichiro c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Nagata, Koichiro c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Tomita, Hiroyuki c/o Hitachi Industrial Equipment Systems Co., Ltd. 1-1, Higashi-Narashino 7-chome Narashino-shi Chiba 275-8611 / JP | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/52] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08011126.3 | 19.06.2008 | [2008/52] | Priority number, date | JP20070161864 | 19.06.2007 Original published format: JP 2007161864 | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2007004 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2007004 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02P21/00 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
H02P21/08 (EP,US);
H02P25/22 (KR);
H02P23/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2009/36] |
Former [2008/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Antriebsmotor-Einheit, Antriebs-System und Hub-System | [2008/52] | English: | Induction motor drive unit, motor drive system, and elevating system | [2008/52] | French: | Unité de commande de moteur à induction, système de commande de moteur, et système d'élévation | [2008/52] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 14.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.07.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0677919 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [Y] 1,3,4,6-14 * column 1, lines 1-10; figures 1-3 * * column 2, lines 1-36 * * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 33 * * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 50 * [A] 2,5; | [Y]EP0771067 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1,3,4,6-14 * column 10, lines 2-52; figure 2 *; | [Y]DE19962690 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1,3,4,6-14 * figures 1-6 *; | [Y]DE3338319 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) [Y] 1,3,4,6-14 * figure 1 * | by applicant | EP0677919 | EP0771067 | DE19962690 | DE3338319 |