EP2011728 - Vehicle having a throttle device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/02] | Throttle device for vehicle | ||
[2009/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2010/04] |
Former [2009/02] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Soda, Hajime c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd., 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
Hibi, Hiroto c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd., 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 03 /
Kondo, Tetsuya c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd., 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2009/02] | Representative(s) | Liska, Horst, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Liska, Horst, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08011619.7 | 26.06.2008 | [2009/02] | Priority number, date | JP20070175247 | 03.07.2007 Original published format: JP 2007175247 | JP20070175246 | 03.07.2007 Original published format: JP 2007175246 | [2009/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2011728 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2011728 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B62K23/04, F02D11/02 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
B62K23/04 (EP,US);
F02D11/02 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2028 (US);
Y10T74/20474 (US)
|
Former IPC [2009/02] | B62K23/04, F02D11/02, F02D11/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/37] |
Former [2009/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeug mit einer Drosselvorrichtung | [2009/49] | English: | Vehicle having a throttle device | [2009/49] | French: | Véhicule comprenant un dispositif d'étranglement | [2009/49] |
Former [2009/02] | Drosselvorrichtung für ein Fahrzeug | ||
Former [2009/02] | Throttle device for vehicle | ||
Former [2009/02] | Dispositif d'étranglement pour véhicule | Examination procedure | 26.06.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 29.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2005041259 (ASAHI DENSO CO LTD) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0035]; figures 1-5 *; | [X]DE10027193 (MAGENWIRTH GMBH CO GUSTAV [DE]) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0032] - [0055]; figure 6 *; | [X]US6038923 (LIN MING-SHYANG [TW]) [X] 1-7 * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 38; figures 1-6 *; | [X]US2004107789 (PEPPARD MICHAEL [US]) [X] 8-12 * paragraphs [0028] - [0043]; figure 11 *; | [X]WO2005042306 (DELPHI TECH INC [US], et al) [X] 8-12 * paragraphs [0015] - [0025]; figures 1-9 *; | [X]US6144125 (BIRKESTRAND ORVILLE J [US], et al) [X] 8-12 * column 4, line 6 - column 12, line 9; figures 1-7 *; | [X]EP0687588 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 8-12 * column 5, line 18 - column 25, line 8; figures 1-40 * | by applicant | JP2005194925 | JP2005041259 | DE10027193 | US6038923 | US2004107789 | WO2005042306 | US6144125 | EP0687588 |