EP2014933 - Fixing device for screws and/or nuts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VEGA Grieshaber KG Hauptstr. 1 - 5 77709 Wolfach / DE | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dietmeier, Jürgen Einbacherstrasse 10 77756 Hausach / DE | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08011665.0 | 27.06.2008 | [2009/03] | Priority number, date | DE20071031991 | 09.07.2007 Original published format: DE102007031991 | [2009/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2014933 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2014933 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16B39/10 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
F16B39/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/38] |
Former [2009/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fixiervorrichtung für Schrauben und/oder Muttern | [2009/03] | English: | Fixing device for screws and/or nuts | [2009/03] | French: | Dispositif de fixation pour vis et/ou écrous | [2009/03] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 09.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.08.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3493026 (DONOFRIO FRANK C, et al) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * [Y] 7; | [XY]US1088515 (BAZIN ALPHONSE [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * the whole document * [Y] 7; | [XY]DE102005051349 (PRILLWITZ ROLF [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,6,8 * the whole document * [Y] 7; | [XY]DE124602 (HOLZRICHTER PETER) [X] 1,6,8 * figures 3,4 * [Y] 7; | [XY]DE3331430 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 7 | by applicant | US3493026 | US1088515 | DE102005051349 | DE124602 | DE3331430 |