EP2067729 - Yarn tension sensor for yarn-feeding devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 03.08.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2012 | Opposition rejected | published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L.G.L. Electronics S.p.A. Via Ugo Foscolo, 156 24024 Gandino (Bergamo) / IT | [2009/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pedrini, Giovanni via Costi 3 24026 Leffe (BG) / IT | 02 /
Castelli, Rosario via San Rocco 15 24024 Gandino (BG) / IT | [2009/24] | Representative(s) | Spandonari, Carlo, et al Spandonari & Modiano s.r.l. Corso Duca degli Abruzzi 16 10129 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | Spandonari, Carlo, et al Spandonari & Modiano s.r.l. corso Duca degli Abruzzi 16 10129 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 08011753.4 | 28.06.2008 | [2009/24] | Priority number, date | EP20070425767 | 03.12.2007 Original published format: EP 07425767 | [2009/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2067729 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2067729 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65H59/40 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
B65H59/40 (EP);
B65H2701/31 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, IT, LI, SE [2010/07] |
Former [2009/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Garnspannungssensor für Garnzuführgeräte | [2009/24] | English: | Yarn tension sensor for yarn-feeding devices | [2009/24] | French: | Capteur de tension de fil pour dispositifs d'alimentation en fil | [2009/24] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2008 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 19.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 13.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.03.2011
ADMISSIBLE MEMMINGER-IRO GmbH Jakob-Mutz-Strasse 7 72280 Dornstetten / DE Opponent's representative Frese, Beate, et al, et al Patentanwältin Hüttenallee 237b 47800 Krefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.03.2011
ADMISSIBLE MEMMINGER-IRO GmbH Jakob-Mutz-Strasse 7 72280 Dornstetten / DE Opponent's representative Frese-Göddeke, Beate, et al, et al Patentanwältin Hüttenallee 237b 47800 Krefeld / DE | 30.05.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.08.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.03.2012 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2012/36] | 05.03.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.03.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.04.2012 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]WO9959909 (ELTEX SWEDEN AB [SE], et al) [DA] 1 * page 1, line 31 - page 2, line 18 * * page 3, line 22; figure - *; | [A]US2457616 (DYKE WILLIAM D VAN, et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 2; figure - *; | [A]EP0534226 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 11, line 4 - line 11; figure - *; | [A]EP0475001 (ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA [US]) [A] 1 * figure 5 *; | [A]WO2004039714 (MEMMINGER IRO GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | EP0707102 | US4752044 | US4953367 | WO9959909 |